This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 08/14/2022 at 07:31:32 (UTC).

CITY OF BAYTOWN vs. MENDIETA, PATRICIA

Case Summary

On 07/21/2022 CITY OF BAYTOWN filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against MENDIETA, PATRICIA. This case was filed in Harris County District Courthouse, Harris County District Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is CHRISTINE WEEMS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****3697

  • Filing Date:

    07/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

CHRISTINE WEEMS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITY OF BAYTOWN

Defendants and Intervenor Plaintiffs

GOOSE CREEK CONSOLIDATED INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT

LEE COLLEGE DISTRICT

Defendants and Intervenor Defendants

MENDIETA, PATRICIA

GOOSE CREEK CONSOLIDATED INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT

LEE COLLEGE DISTRICT

HARRIS COUNTY

HARRIS COUNTY HOSPITAL DISTRICT

HARRIS COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION

PORT OF HOUSTON AUTHORITY OF HARRIS COUNTY

HARRIS COUNTY FLOOD CONTROL DISTRICT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STRONG, RANDALL B.

Intervenor Plaintiff Attorney

BENOIT, BRANDON ERIC

 

Court Documents

Plaintiff's Original Petition

07/21/2022: Plaintiff's Original Petition

Citation In Delinquent Tax Suit

07/21/2022: Citation In Delinquent Tax Suit

Civil Process Request

07/21/2022: Civil Process Request

Exhibit A

07/21/2022: Exhibit A

Intervenors' Original Petition

07/27/2022: Intervenors' Original Petition

Exhibit A

07/27/2022: Exhibit A

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: INTERVENTION; Filing Attorney: BENOIT, BRANDON ERIC; Person Filing: GOOSE CREEK CONSOLIDATED INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: INTERVENTION; Filing Attorney: BENOIT, BRANDON ERIC; Person Filing: LEE COLLEGE DISTRICT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: MENDIETA, PATRICIA; Issued: 7/21/2022; Served: 8/2/2022; Returned: 8/3/2022; Received: 8/8/2022; Tracking: 74029145; Deliver To: CONSTABLE PCT 1 TAX SUIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: STRONG, RANDALL B.; Person Filing: CITY OF BAYTOWN;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LEE COLLEGE DISTRICT (A TEXAS NON-PROFIT CORPORATION) (IN REM ONLY) is a litigant

Latest cases where GOOSE CREEK CONSOLIDATED ISD is a litigant

Latest cases where PORT OF HOUSTON AUTHORITY OF HARRIS COUNTY is a litigant

Latest cases where HARRIS COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION is a litigant