This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 12/06/2021 at 07:40:21 (UTC).

CITY OF BAYTOWN vs. LAUGHLIN, PATRICIA A TAYLOR

Case Summary

On 11/12/2021 CITY OF BAYTOWN filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against LAUGHLIN, PATRICIA A TAYLOR. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is DONNA ROTH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****4481

  • Filing Date:

    11/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

DONNA ROTH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITY OF BAYTOWN

Intervenor Plaintiffs and Defendants

GOOSE CREEK CONSOLIDATED INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT

LEE COLLEGE DISTRICT

Intervenor Defendants and Defendants

LAUGHLIN, PATRICIA A TAYLOR

Baytown, TX 77521

GOOSE CREEK CONSOLIDATED INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT

LEE COLLEGE DISTRICT

HARRIS COUNTY

HARRIS COUNTY HOSPITAL DISTRICT

HARRIS COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION

PORT OF HOUSTON AUTHORITY OF HARRIS COUNTY

HARRIS COUNTY FLOOD CONTROL DISTRICT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STRONG, RANDALL B.

Intervenor Plaintiff Attorney

BENOIT, BRANDON ERIC

 

Court Documents

Intervenors' Original Petition

11/16/2021: Intervenors' Original Petition

Exhibit

11/16/2021: Exhibit

Plaintiff's Original Petition

11/12/2021: Plaintiff's Original Petition

CITATION

11/12/2021: CITATION

Civil Process Request

11/12/2021: Civil Process Request

Exhibit A

11/12/2021: Exhibit A

Original Intervention

12/02/2021: Original Intervention

Citation in Delinquent Tax Suit

11/22/2021: Citation in Delinquent Tax Suit

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: INTERVENTION; Filing Attorney: BENOIT, BRANDON ERIC; Person Filing: GOOSE CREEK CONSOLIDATED INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: INTERVENTION; Filing Attorney: BENOIT, BRANDON ERIC; Person Filing: LEE COLLEGE DISTRICT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: LAUGHLIN, PATRICIA A TAYLOR; Issued: 11/12/2021; Served: 11/17/2021; Returned: 11/18/2021; Tracking: 73938487; Deliver To: CONSTABLE PCT 1 TAX SUIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: STRONG, RANDALL B.; Person Filing: CITY OF BAYTOWN;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LEE COLLEGE DISTRICT (A TEXAS NON-PROFIT CORPORATION) (IN REM ONLY) is a litigant

Latest cases where GOOSE CREEK CONSOLIDATED ISD is a litigant