This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 12/09/2022 at 07:21:22 (UTC).

CITY OF BAYTOWN vs. HART, BRIAN

Case Summary

On 11/15/2022 CITY OF BAYTOWN filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against HART, BRIAN. This case was filed in Harris County District Courthouse, Harris County District Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is BEAU MILLER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****5111

  • Filing Date:

    11/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

BEAU MILLER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITY OF BAYTOWN

Defendants

HART, BRIAN

Baytown, TX 77520

GOOSE CREEK CONSOLIDATED INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT

LEE COLLEGE

HARRIS COUNTY

HARRIS COUNTY HOSPITAL DISTRICT

HARRIS COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION

PORT OF HOUSTON OF HARRIS COUNTY AUTHORITY

HARRIS COUNTY FLOOD CONTROL DISTRICT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STRONG, RANDALL B.

 

Court Documents

Exhibit A

11/15/2022: Exhibit A

Civil Process Request

11/15/2022: Civil Process Request

CITATION IN DELINQUENT TAX SUIT

11/15/2022: CITATION IN DELINQUENT TAX SUIT

PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION

11/15/2022: PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION

Exhibit

12/06/2022: Exhibit

Intervenors' original petition

12/06/2022: Intervenors' original petition

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: INTERVENTION; Filing Attorney: BENOIT, BRANDON ERIC; Person Filing: Not Downloaded;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: INTERVENTION; Filing Attorney: BENOIT, BRANDON ERIC; Person Filing: Not Downloaded;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Person Filing: HART, BRIAN;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HART, BRIAN; Issued: 11/16/2022; Served: 11/28/2022; Returned: 11/29/2022; Tracking: 74078619; Deliver To: CONSTABLE PCT 1 TAX SUIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: STRONG, RANDALL B.; Person Filing: CITY OF BAYTOWN;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less