This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 03/19/2022 at 02:53:23 (UTC).

CITY OF BAYTOWN vs. COOPER, LUCILLE M

Case Summary

On 01/04/2022 CITY OF BAYTOWN filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against COOPER, LUCILLE M. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is LATOSHA LEWIS PAYNE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0464

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

LATOSHA LEWIS PAYNE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CITY OF BAYTOWN

BAYTOWN PUBLIC IMPROVEMENT DISTRICT NUMBER ONE

Defendants and Intervenor Plaintiffs

GOOSE CREEK CONSOLIDATED INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT

LEE COLLEGE DISTRICT

Defendants and Intervenor Defendants

COOPER, LUCILLE M

Houston, TX 77067

GOOSE CREEK CONSOLIDATED INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT

LEE COLLEGE DISTRICT

HARRIS COUNTY

HARRIS COUNTY HOSPITAL DISTRICT

HARRIS COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION

PORT OF HOUSTON AUTHORITY OF HARRIS COUNTY

HARRIS COUNTY FLOOD CONTROL DISTRICT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STRONG, RANDALL B.

Intervenor Plaintiff Attorney

BENOIT, BRANDON ERIC

 

Court Documents

Plaintiff's Original Petition

01/04/2022: Plaintiff's Original Petition

Citation In Delinquent Tax Suit

01/04/2022: Citation In Delinquent Tax Suit

Civil Process Request

01/04/2022: Civil Process Request

Exhibit A

01/04/2022: Exhibit A

Citation in Delinquent Tax Suit

02/04/2022: Citation in Delinquent Tax Suit

Intervenors' original petition

01/06/2022: Intervenors' original petition

Exhibit

01/06/2022: Exhibit

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: INTERVENTION; Filing Attorney: BENOIT, BRANDON ERIC; Person Filing: LEE COLLEGE DISTRICT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: INTERVENTION; Filing Attorney: BENOIT, BRANDON ERIC; Person Filing: GOOSE CREEK CONSOLIDATED INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE RETURNED/UNEXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: COOPER, LUCILLE M; Issued: 1/4/2022; Returned: 2/2/2022; Tracking: 73957366; Deliver To: CONSTABLE PCT 1 TAX SUIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: STRONG, RANDALL B.; Person Filing: BAYTOWN PUBLIC IMPROVEMENT DISTRICT NUMBER ONE;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: STRONG, RANDALL B.; Person Filing: CITY OF BAYTOWN;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LEE COLLEGE DISTRICT (A TEXAS NON-PROFIT CORPORATION) (IN REM ONLY) is a litigant

Latest cases where GOOSE CREEK CONSOLIDATED ISD is a litigant

Latest cases where PORT OF HOUSTON AUTHORITY OF HARRIS COUNTY is a litigant