Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/12/2020 at 11:33:15 (UTC).

CITY OF BAYTOWN vs. CAVAZOS, DIEGO

Case Summary

On 03/26/2020 CITY OF BAYTOWN filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against CAVAZOS, DIEGO. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is KRISTEN BRAUCHLE HAWKINS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****9418

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

KRISTEN BRAUCHLE HAWKINS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITY OF BAYTOWN

Defendants

HARRIS COUNTY

HARRIS COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION

LEE COLLEGE

GOOSE CREEK CONSOLIDATED INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT

CAVAZOS, DIEGO

Baytown, TX 77520

CAVAZOS, YOLONDA

Baytown, TX 77520

PORT OF HOUSTON OF HARRIS COUNTY AUTHORITY

HARRIS COUNTY FLOOD CONTROL DISTRICT

HARRIS COUNTY HOSPITAL DISTRICT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STRONG, RANDALL B.

 

Court Documents

Citation in Delinquent Tax Suit

06/02/2020: Citation in Delinquent Tax Suit

Citation in Delinquent Tax Suit

06/02/2020: Citation in Delinquent Tax Suit

Exhibit 01

03/26/2020: Exhibit 01

Civil Process Request

03/26/2020: Civil Process Request

Citation In Delinquent Tax Suit

03/26/2020: Citation In Delinquent Tax Suit

Citation In Delinquent Tax Suit

03/26/2020: Citation In Delinquent Tax Suit

Plaintiff's Original Petition

03/26/2020: Plaintiff's Original Petition

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: CAVAZOS, YOLONDA; Issued: 3/26/2020; Served: 5/29/2020; Returned: 5/29/2020; Tracking: 73738404; Deliver To: CONSTABLE PCT 1 TAX SUIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: CAVAZOS, DIEGO; Issued: 3/26/2020; Served: 5/29/2020; Returned: 5/29/2020; Tracking: 73738403; Deliver To: CONSTABLE PCT 1 TAX SUIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: STRONG, RANDALL B.; Person Filing: CITY OF BAYTOWN;

    Read MoreRead Less