This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 08/14/2022 at 07:32:26 (UTC).

CITY OF BAYTOWN vs. CASTILLO, MARIA

Case Summary

On 07/21/2022 CITY OF BAYTOWN filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against CASTILLO, MARIA. This case was filed in Harris County District Courthouse, Harris County District Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is TANYA GARRISON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****3705

  • Filing Date:

    07/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

TANYA GARRISON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITY OF BAYTOWN

Defendants and Intervenor Plaintiffs

HARRIS COUNTY

HARRIS COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION

PORT OF HOUSTON AUTHORITY OF HARRIS COUNTY

HARRIS COUNTY FLOOD CONTROL DISTRICT

HARRIS COUNTY HOSPITAL DISRICT

Intervenor Defendants and Defendants

CASTILLO, MARIA

Baytown, TX 77520

BARRANCO, ISRAEL

Baytown, TX 77520

GOOSE CREEK CONSOLIDATED INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT

LEE COLLEGE

HARRIS COUNTY

HARRIS COUNTY HOSPITAL DISTRICT

HARRIS COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION

PORT OF HOUSTON OF HARRIS COUNTY AUTHORITY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorney

STRONG, RANDALL B.

Intervenor Plaintiff Attorney

EDWARDS, DAMON DAWAIN

 

Court Documents

Plaintiff's Original Petition

07/21/2022: Plaintiff's Original Petition

Citation In Delinquent Tax Suit

07/21/2022: Citation In Delinquent Tax Suit

Citation In Delinquent Tax Suit

07/21/2022: Citation In Delinquent Tax Suit

Civil Process Request

07/21/2022: Civil Process Request

Exhibit A

07/21/2022: Exhibit A

Original Intervention

07/28/2022: Original Intervention

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: INTERVENTION; Filing Attorney: EDWARDS, DAMON DAWAIN; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY HOSPITAL DISRICT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: INTERVENTION; Filing Attorney: EDWARDS, DAMON DAWAIN; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: INTERVENTION; Filing Attorney: EDWARDS, DAMON DAWAIN; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY FLOOD CONTROL DISTRICT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: INTERVENTION; Filing Attorney: EDWARDS, DAMON DAWAIN; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: INTERVENTION; Filing Attorney: EDWARDS, DAMON DAWAIN; Person Filing: PORT OF HOUSTON AUTHORITY OF HARRIS COUNTY;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: BARRANCO, ISRAEL; Issued: 7/22/2022; Served: 8/5/2022; Returned: 8/5/2022; Tracking: 74029569; Deliver To: CONSTABLE PCT 1 TAX SUIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: CASTILLO, MARIA; Issued: 7/22/2022; Served: 8/5/2022; Returned: 8/5/2022; Tracking: 74029567; Deliver To: CONSTABLE PCT 1 TAX SUIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: STRONG, RANDALL B.; Person Filing: CITY OF BAYTOWN;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LEE COLLEGE is a litigant

Latest cases where PORT OF HOUSTON OF HARRIS COUNTY AUTHORITY is a litigant

Latest cases where GOOSE CREEK CONSOLIDATED ISD is a litigant

Latest cases where PORT OF HOUSTON AUTHORITY OF HARRIS COUNTY is a litigant