This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 11/19/2021 at 07:18:32 (UTC).

CITY OF BAYTOWN vs. BYRD, ROBERT

Case Summary

On 10/26/2021 CITY OF BAYTOWN filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against BYRD, ROBERT. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is LAUREN REEDER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0335

  • Filing Date:

    10/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

LAUREN REEDER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITY OF BAYTOWN

Defendants and Intervenor Plaintiffs

GOOSE CREEK CONSOLIDATED INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT

LEE COLLEGE DISTRICT

Defendants and Intervenor Defendants

BYRD, ROBERT

Houston, TX 77055

BYRD, SUSAN

Houston, TX 77055

GOOSE CREEK CONSOLIDATED INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT

LEE COLLEGE

HARRIS COUNTY

HARRIS COUNTY HOSPITAL DISTRICT

HARRSI COUNTY DEPARTEMENT OF EDUCATION

PORT OF HOUSTON OF HARRIS COUNTY AUTHORITY

HARRIS COUNTY FLOOD CONTROL DISTRICT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STRONG, RANDALL B.

Intervenor Plaintiff Attorney

BENOIT, BRANDON ERIC

 

Court Documents

Intervenors' original petition

10/29/2021: Intervenors' original petition

Exhibit A

10/29/2021: Exhibit A

Plaintiff's Original Petition

10/26/2021: Plaintiff's Original Petition

Citation In Delinquent Tax Suit

10/26/2021: Citation In Delinquent Tax Suit

Citation In Delinquent Tax Suit

10/26/2021: Citation In Delinquent Tax Suit

Civil Process Request

10/26/2021: Civil Process Request

Exhibit A

10/26/2021: Exhibit A

Citation in Delinquent Tax Suit

11/04/2021: Citation in Delinquent Tax Suit

Citation in Delinquent Tax Suit

11/04/2021: Citation in Delinquent Tax Suit

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketDescription: INTERVENTION; Filing Attorney: BENOIT, BRANDON ERIC; Person Filing: GOOSE CREEK CONSOLIDATED INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketDescription: INTERVENTION; Filing Attorney: BENOIT, BRANDON ERIC; Person Filing: LEE COLLEGE DISTRICT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE RETURNED/UNEXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: BYRD, SUSAN; Issued: 10/26/2021; Returned: 11/3/2021; Received: 11/4/2021; Tracking: 73931803; Deliver To: CONSTABLE PCT 1 TAX SUIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE RETURNED/UNEXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: BYRD, ROBERT; Issued: 10/26/2021; Returned: 11/3/2021; Received: 11/4/2021; Tracking: 73931801; Deliver To: CONSTABLE PCT 1 TAX SUIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: STRONG, RANDALL B.; Person Filing: CITY OF BAYTOWN;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LEE COLLEGE is a litigant

Latest cases where PORT OF HOUSTON OF HARRIS COUNTY AUTHORITY is a litigant

Latest cases where GOOSE CREEK CONSOLIDATED ISD is a litigant

Latest cases where HARRIS COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION is a litigant