Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/12/2020 at 11:52:24 (UTC).

CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY (AS SUBROGEE OF ELIAS HENRY HOCHMAN) vs. ESPINAL-SANCHEZ, JASON

Case Summary

On 03/26/2020 CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY AS SUBROGEE OF ELIAS HENRY HOCHMAN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ESPINAL-SANCHEZ, JASON. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is LATOSHA LEWIS PAYNE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****9642

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

LATOSHA LEWIS PAYNE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY (AS SUBROGEE OF ELIAS HENRY HOCHMAN)

Defendants

ESPINAL-SANCHEZ, JASON

Houston, TX 77035

MEDRANO-TURCIOS, ELVIS

Houston, TX 77045

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HARDESTY, RWAN SAFFARINI

 

Court Documents

Citation Return

05/19/2020: Citation Return

ORIGINAL PETITION AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURES

03/26/2020: ORIGINAL PETITION AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURES

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: MEDRANO-TURCIOS, ELVIS; Issued: 3/30/2020; Served: 5/18/2020; Tracking: 73738676; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: ESPINAL-SANCHEZ, JASON; Issued: 3/30/2020; Tracking: 73738675; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: HARDESTY, RWAN SAFFARINI; Person Filing: CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY (AS SUBROGEE OF ELIAS HENRY HOCHMAN);

    Read MoreRead Less