This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 07/30/2020 at 07:19:22 (UTC).

CHROME CAPITAL vs. WELLS FARGO BANK N A

Case Summary

On 07/06/2020 CHROME CAPITAL filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against WELLS FARGO BANK N A. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL GOMEZ. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******162A

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

MICHAEL GOMEZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHROME CAPITAL

Defendants

WELLS FARGO BANK N A

ASUNCION, RITA GARCIA

RGA HOME HEALTH SERVICES INC

Other

WELLS FARGO BANK N A BY SERVING ITS REGISTERED AGENT CORPORATION

211 E 7Th Street Suite 620

Austin, TX 78701

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

REGENT, ANH HUYNH

3601 Audubon Pl

Houston, TX 77006

Defendant Attorney

PEARSON, JAMES HARALSON

2900 Weslayan #

Houston, TX 77027

 

Court Documents

Affidavit of Service

07/15/2020: Affidavit of Service

Notice of Garnishment

07/20/2020: Notice of Garnishment

Garnishee's Original Answer

07/20/2020: Garnishee's Original Answer

Proposed Order of Dismissal - Wells Fargo

07/28/2020: Proposed Order of Dismissal - Wells Fargo

Notice of Non-Suit Garnishment - Wells Fargo

07/28/2020: Notice of Non-Suit Garnishment - Wells Fargo

ORDER OF NON-SUIT SIGNED

07/29/2020: ORDER OF NON-SUIT SIGNED

Cover letter for Writ of Garnishment - Wells Fargo

07/06/2020: Cover letter for Writ of Garnishment - Wells Fargo

Application for Writ of Garnishment - Wells Fargo

07/06/2020: Application for Writ of Garnishment - Wells Fargo

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketDescription: NO COSTS ALLOCATED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORDER OF NONSUIT SIGNED; Order Signed: 7/29/2020;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: PEARSON, JAMES HARALSON; Person Filing: WELLS FARGO BANK N A;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketType of Service: GARNISHMENT AFTER JUDGMENT; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: GARNISHMENT APPLICATION; Person: WELLS FARGO BANK N A BY SERVING ITS REGISTERED AGENT CORPORATION; Issued: 7/6/2020; Served: 7/8/2020; Received: 7/16/2020; Tracking: 73763983; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: REGENT, ANH HUYNH; Person Filing: CHROME CAPITAL;

    Read MoreRead Less