This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 10/08/2022 at 07:26:12 (UTC).

CHICK-FIL-A INC AS OWNER AND LESSEE vs. HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT

Case Summary

On 09/14/2022 CHICK-FIL-A INC AS OWNER AND LESSEE filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT. This case was filed in Harris County District Courthouse, Harris County District Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is SCOT DOLLINGER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8661

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

SCOT DOLLINGER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHICK-FIL-A INC AS OWNER AND LESSEE

Defendant

HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT

Other

HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT BY SERVING ITS CHIEF APPRAISER MR

13013 Northwest Freeway

Houston, TX 77040

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHROFF, JAY MANISH

 

Court Documents

Plaintiffs Original Petition with Disclosures

09/14/2022: Plaintiffs Original Petition with Disclosures

Citation

09/30/2022: Citation

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT BY SERVING ITS CHIEF APPRAISER MR; Issued: 9/14/2022; Served: 9/29/2022; Returned: 9/29/2022; Tracking: 74051846; Deliver To: CONST 1 ALAN ROSEN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: SHROFF, JAY MANISH; Person Filing: CHICK-FIL-A INC AS OWNER AND LESSEE;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT is a litigant

Latest cases where CHICK FIL A INC. is a litigant