This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/18/2015 at 23:11:10 (UTC).

CHAPMAN, YVONNE J vs. NATIONAL CAR RENTAL US INC

Case Summary

On 12/02/2004 CHAPMAN, YVONNE J filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against NATIONAL CAR RENTAL US INC. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8472

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHAPMAN, YVONNE J

Defendants

NATIONAL CAR RENTAL US INC

OVERTON, ZACHARY R

ELECTRONIC DATA SYSTEMS CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VUJASINOVIC, VUK

Defendant Attorney

UNDERWOOD, WILLIAM B. III

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/26/2006
  • NO COSTS ALLOCATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2006
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, FINAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2006
  • HOLD FOR JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2005
  • SECOND AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - VUJASINOVIC, VUK Person Filing - CHAPMAN, YVONNE J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2005
  • ANSWER FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - UNDERWOOD, WILLIAM B. III Person Filing - ELECTRONIC DATA SYSTEMS CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2005
  • ANSWER FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - UNDERWOOD, WILLIAM B. III Person Filing - ELECTRONIC DATA SYSTEMS CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2005
  • FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - VUJASINOVIC, VUK Person Filing - CHAPMAN, YVONNE J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2005
  • DESIGNATED TRIAL READY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - UNDERWOOD, WILLIAM B. III Person Filing - OVERTON, ZACHARY R

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - UNDERWOOD, WILLIAM B. III Person Filing - NATIONAL CAR RENTAL US INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2004
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - VUJASINOVIC, VUK Person Filing - CHAPMAN, YVONNE J

    Read MoreRead Less