This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 09/20/2018 at 19:27:14 (UTC).

CHANNELVIEW INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT vs. DIAMANTE NEGRO NIGHT CLUB INC (A/K/A DIA

Case Summary

On 01/08/2016 CHANNELVIEW INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against DIAMANTE NEGRO NIGHT CLUB INC A/K/A DIA. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is SYLVIA A. MATTHEWS. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1134

  • Filing Date:

    01/08/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

SYLVIA A. MATTHEWS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHANNELVIEW INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT

1235 North Loop West

Houston, TX 77008

Intervenor Plaintiffs

HARRIS COUNTY WATER CONTROL & IMPROVEMENT DISTRICT # 21

HARRIS COUNTY HOSPITAL DISTRICT

HARRIS COUNTY FLOOD CONTROL DISTRICT

HARRIS COUNTY

SAN JACINTO COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT

HARRIS COUNTY EMERGENCY SERVICE DISTRICT # 50

HARRIS COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION

PORT OF HOUSTON AUTHORITY OF HARRIS COUNTY

Defendants and Intervenor Defendants

DIAMANTE NEGRO NIGHT CLUB INC (A/K/A DIAMANTE NEGRO DISCO)

1725 Miles Street

Houston, TX 77015

SAN JACINTO COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT (IN REM ONLY)

1001 Preston 1St Floor

Houston, TX 77002

DIAMANTE NEGRO NIGHT CLUB INC (AKA DIAMANTE NEGRO DISCO) (A TEXAS

Others

DIAMANTE NEGRO NIGHT CLUB INC (A/K/A DIAMANTE NEGRO DISCO BY SERVING

15934 East Freeway

Channelview, TX 77530

SAN JACINTO COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT (IN REM ONLY) BY SERVING ITS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BAILEY, JASON L.

Intervenor Plaintiff Attorneys

STONE, HERBERT ALONZO III

SNOOKS, DANIEL JOSEPH

 

Court Documents

CITATION IN DELINQUENT TAX SUIT

01/08/2016: CITATION IN DELINQUENT TAX SUIT

PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION

01/08/2016: PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION

Citation in Delinquent Tax Suit

01/14/2016: Citation in Delinquent Tax Suit

EXHIBIT A

04/22/2016: EXHIBIT A

ORIGINAL PETITION IN INTERVENTION DIAMANTE

01/19/2016: ORIGINAL PETITION IN INTERVENTION DIAMANTE

ALIAS CITATION IN DELINQUENT TAX SUIT

02/08/2016: ALIAS CITATION IN DELINQUENT TAX SUIT

Citation in Delinquent Tax Suit

02/23/2016: Citation in Delinquent Tax Suit

Original Intervention

03/30/2016: Original Intervention

Proposed Order

03/30/2016: Proposed Order

Affidavit Of Cost

04/22/2016: Affidavit Of Cost

Affidavit Of Research Cost

04/22/2016: Affidavit Of Research Cost

Certificate Of Last Known Mailing Address

04/22/2016: Certificate Of Last Known Mailing Address

Notice Of Submission

04/22/2016: Notice Of Submission

Affidavit- Proof of Service

08/08/2016: Affidavit- Proof of Service

Proposed Order

09/07/2016: Proposed Order

NOTICE OF SUBMISSION

09/07/2016: NOTICE OF SUBMISSION

Motion For Default Judgment

09/07/2016: Motion For Default Judgment

Writ of Execution

03/07/2017: Writ of Execution

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/20/2016
  • Description: ORDER SGND GRANTING SALE OF PROPERTY; Order Signed: 9/20/2016;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2016
  • Description: DEFENDANT COSTS;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2016
  • Description: DEFAULT JUDGMENT SIGNED; Order Signed: 9/20/2016;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2016
  • Description: ORDER SIGNED DENYING DEFAULT JUDGMENT; Order Signed: 4/27/2016;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2016
  • Description: INTERVENTION; Filing Attorney: STONE, HERBERT ALONZO III; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2016
  • Description: INTERVENTION; Filing Attorney: STONE, HERBERT ALONZO III; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY EMERGENCY SERVICE DISTRICT # 50;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2016
  • Description: INTERVENTION; Filing Attorney: STONE, HERBERT ALONZO III; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY HOSPITAL DISTRICT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2016
  • Description: INTERVENTION; Filing Attorney: STONE, HERBERT ALONZO III; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2016
  • Description: INTERVENTION; Filing Attorney: STONE, HERBERT ALONZO III; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY WATER CONTROL & IMPROVEMENT DISTRICT # 21;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2016
  • Description: INTERVENTION; Filing Attorney: STONE, HERBERT ALONZO III; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY FLOOD CONTROL DISTRICT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2016
  • Description: INTERVENTION; Filing Attorney: STONE, HERBERT ALONZO III; Person Filing: PORT OF HOUSTON AUTHORITY OF HARRIS COUNTY;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2016
  • Description: INTERVENTION; Filing Attorney: SNOOKS, DANIEL JOSEPH; Person Filing: SAN JACINTO COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2016
  • Description: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: BAILEY, JASON L.; Person Filing: CHANNELVIEW INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT;

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.