This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/18/2015 at 23:28:33 (UTC).

CHANDLER, BILL vs. TEXACO INC

Case Summary

On 12/02/2004 CHANDLER, BILL filed an Other - Complex Tort/Class Action lawsuit against TEXACO INC. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8706

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Complex Tort/Class Action

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHANDLER, BILL

Defendants

TEXACO INC

AIR LIQUIDE AMERICA CORP

ALLIEDSIGNAL INC

AMERIPOL SYNPOL CORP

AMOCO OIL CO

ARCO CHEMICAL CO

ATLANTIC RICHFIELD CO

B A S F CORP

B F GOODRICH CORP

B P EXPLORATION & OIL INC

B P OIL CORP

BASIS PETROLEUM INC

BEAZER EAST INC

BEAZER MATERIALS & SERVICES INC

BIG THREE INDUSTRIES INC

CANADIANOXY OFFSHORE PRODUCTION CO

CHAMPION INTERNATIONAL CORP

CHEVRON CHEMICAL CO

CHEVRON USA INC

61 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GIBLIN, AARYN KEMP

Defendant Attorneys

ELLISTON, GARY D.

KROGER, BILL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/10/2015
  • ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2015
  • NO COSTS ALLOCATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2005
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2005
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2005
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2005
  • ORDER SIGNED SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2005
  • ORDER SIGNED SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2005
  • AMENDED ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - ELLISTON, GARY D. Person Filing - MOBILE CHEMICAL CO INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2005
  • AMENDED ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - ELLISTON, GARY D. Person Filing - MOBILE OIL REFINING CORP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2005
  • FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - GIBLIN, AARYN KEMP Person Filing - CHANDLER, BILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2005
  • FIFTEENTH AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - GIBLIN, AARYN KEMP Person Filing - CHANDLER, BILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2004
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - GIBLIN, AARYN KEMP Person Filing - CHANDLER, BILL

    Read MoreRead Less