This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/24/2015 at 12:07:37 (UTC).

CEDARPOST TOWNHOUSE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATI vs. MAYO, RICHARD

Case Summary

On 08/30/2004 CEDARPOST TOWNHOUSE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATI filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against MAYO, RICHARD. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****7546

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CEDARPOST TOWNHOUSE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

Defendant

MAYO, RICHARD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LINCOLN, ARTHUR M.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/02/2005
  • DISMISSED ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2005
  • EACH PAY OWN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2005
  • DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2005
  • DESIGNATED TRIAL READY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2004
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2004
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - LINCOLN, ARTHUR M. Person Filing - CEDARPOST TOWNHOUSE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

    Read MoreRead Less