This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/19/2020 at 07:31:17 (UTC).

CAVAZOS, ANGELITA V vs. WAL-MART STORES TEXAS LLC

Case Summary

On 05/26/2020 CAVAZOS, ANGELITA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against vs WAL-MART STORES TEXAS LLC. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is FREDERICKA PHILLIPS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1615

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

FREDERICKA PHILLIPS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAVAZOS, ANGELITA V

Defendants

WAL-MART STORES TEXAS LLC

DOE, JOHN

Houston, TX 77068

Other

WALMART STORES OF TEXAS LLC

1999 Bryan Street Suite 900

Dallas, TX 75201

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NIELSEN, ERIC DAVID

 

Court Documents

Certified Mail Tracking # 7018 1830 0001 4427 1654

05/29/2020: Certified Mail Tracking # 7018 1830 0001 4427 1654

Certified Mail Receipt

06/01/2020: Certified Mail Receipt

Citation

06/17/2020: Citation

CIVIL PROCESS REQUEST

05/26/2020: CIVIL PROCESS REQUEST

PLAINTIFFS ORIGINAL PETITION REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION AND FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES

05/26/2020: PLAINTIFFS ORIGINAL PETITION REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION AND FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: DOE, JOHN; Issued: 5/29/2020; Tracking: 73753763; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (CERTIFIED); Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: WALMART STORES OF TEXAS LLC; Issued: 5/29/2020; Served: 6/3/2020; Tracking: 73753748; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (CERTIFIED); Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: WALMART STORES OF TEXAS LLC; Issued: 5/29/2020; Served: 6/3/2020; Tracking: 73753748; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: NIELSEN, ERIC DAVID; Person Filing: CAVAZOS, ANGELITA V;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less