Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 07/10/2015 at 10:01:12 (UTC).

CAUDILL, FRANK vs. UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION (DBA UNION CARBIDE CHEMI

Case Summary

On 07/08/2005 CAUDILL, FRANK filed an Other - Complex Tort/Class Action lawsuit against UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION DBA UNION CARBIDE CHEMI. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****4573

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2005

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Complex Tort/Class Action

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAUDILL, FRANK

Defendants

UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION (DBA UNION CARBIDE CHEMICALS AND PLASTICS

UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION CHEMICALS AND PLASTICS

3M COMPANY (FKA MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING CO)

MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING CO

AMERICAN OPTICAL CORPORATION (IND AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO

DEVILBISS INDUSTRIAL PRODUCTS CORPORATION

AMETEK INC (SUCCESSOR-TO-HAVEG INDUSTRIES INC)

A M F INCORPORATED (IND AND AS SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO B&B ENGINEERING

AQUA-CHEM INC (DBA CLEAVER-BROOKS DIVISION)

CLEAVER-BROOKS DIVISION

BABCOCK BORSIG POWER INC (FKA DB RILEY INC FKA RILEY STOKER

DB RILEY INC

RILEY STOKER CORPORATION

BECHTEL CORPORATION (FKA BECHTEL CIVIL & MINERALS INC FKA CECHTEL

BECHTEL CIVIL & MINERALS INC

BECHTEL CIVIL INC

BECHTEL GROUP INC

BECHTEL POWER CORPORATION

CERTAINTEED CORPORATION

54 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PARTIDA-KIPNESS, ROBBIE S.

Defendant Attorneys

POWERS, JAMES H.

ELLISTON, GARY D.

WHITE, CLAY M.

Other Attorneys

LOWERY, JAMES A. III

PAPPAS, GEORGE P.

ADAMS, KENT M.

ANDREWS, PATRICIA KAY

WADE, TODD N.

ARREDONDO, ROBERT DAVID

EDWARDS, BRADY SHERROD

SHEEHY, RICHARD A.

RHODES, KENNETH D.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/15/2015
  • ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2015
  • NO COSTS ALLOCATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2010
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2008
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - PAPPAS, GEORGE P. Person Filing - FBCO INC (FKA NATKIN SERVICE CO FKA NATKIN SERVICE CO OF KANSAS CITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - ADAMS, KENT M. Person Filing - FLUOR ENTERPRISES INC (DBA FLUOR DANIEL FLUOR GLOBAL SERVICES FLUOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - PAPPAS, GEORGE P. Person Filing - NATKIN SERVICE CO OF KANSAS CITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - POWERS, JAMES H. Person Filing - AMERICAN OPTICAL CORPORATION (IND AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - EDWARDS, BRADY SHERROD Person Filing - SANTA FE BRAUN INC (FKA C F BRAUN & COMPANY IND AND AS SUCCESSOR TO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - ELLISTON, GARY D. Person Filing - UNION CARBIDE CHEMICALS AND PLASTICS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 07/29/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - SMITH, J. MICHAEL Person Filing - H B ZACHRY COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - LEVINE, TORI SMITH Person Filing - A M F INCORPORATED (IND AND AS SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO B&B ENGINEERING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - RHODES, KENNETH D. Person Filing - METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - ADAMS, KENT M. Person Filing - FLUOR CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - SHEEHY, RICHARD A. Person Filing - TH AGRICULTURE & NUTRITION CO L L C (SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO TH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2005
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - PARTIDA-KIPNESS, ROBBIE S. Person Filing - CAUDILL, FRANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - ELLISTON, GARY D. Person Filing - UNION CARBIDE CHEMICALS AND PLASTICS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - ELLISTON, GARY D. Person Filing - UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION (D/B/A UNION CARBIDE CHEMICALS AND PLASTICS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - ELLISTON, GARY D. Person Filing - CERTAINTEED CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - ELLISTON, GARY D. Person Filing - DANA CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DEVILBISS INDUSTRIAL PRODUCTS CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where BECHTEL POWER CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where BECHTEL GROUP INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where BECHTEL CIVIL & MINERALS INC is a litigant