Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 02/06/2021 at 07:50:34 (UTC).

CASTRO, SILVIA LORENA vs. HOUSTON POLICE DEPARTMENT ATTN: EXPUNCTIONS

Case Summary

On 01/13/2021 CASTRO, SILVIA LORENA filed an Other - Expungement lawsuit against HOUSTON POLICE DEPARTMENT ATTN EXPUNCTIONS. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is FREDERICKA PHILLIPS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2045

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Expungement

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

FREDERICKA PHILLIPS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CASTRO, SILVIA LORENA

Defendants

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERK?S OFFICE

TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY CRIME RECORDS SERVICE MSC 0234

HARRIS COUNTY ATTORNEY?S OFFICE

HARRIS COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF COMMUNITY SUPERVISION AND CORRECTIONS

HARRIS COUNTY SHERRIFF?S DEPARTMENT ATTN: EXPUNCTIONS

HARRIS COUNTY PRETRIAL SERVICES

HOUSTON POLICE DEPARTMENT ATTN: EXPUNCTIONS

HARRIS COUNTY CLERK?S OFFICE

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY?S OFFICE

Others

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE BY SERVING BRIAN L. ROSE

1310 Prairie 5Th Floor

Houston, TX 77002

HARRIS COUNTY CLERK BY SERVING RANDALL SMIDT

1310 Prairie Ste 880

Houston, TX 77002

HARRIS COUNTY ATTORNEY'S OFFICE BY SERVING RANDALL SMIDT

1310 Prairie Ste 880

Houston, TX 77002

HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT BY SERVING MAJOR MAC MCKELVY

1200 Baker Street

Houston, TX 77011

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERK'S OFFICE BY SERVING RANDALL SMIDT

1310 Prairie Ste 880

Houston, TX 77002

HARRIS COUNTY PRETRIAL SERVICES BY SERVING KELVIN L BANKS DIRECTOR

102 San Jacinto

Houston, TX 77002

TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY BY SERVING EXPUNCTION UNIT

Po Box 4143

Austin, TX 78765

SOUTHEAST TEXAS CRIME INFORMATION CENTER (SETCIC) BY SERVING

406 Caroline

Houston, TX 77002

COMMUNITY SUPERVISION & CORRECTIONS BY SERVING DR TERESA MAY PHD

49 San Jacinto

Houston, TX 77002

HOUSTON POLICE DEPARTMENT BY SERVING DEIDRE HARRIS

1200 Travis 16Th Floor

Houston, TX 77002

2 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FERNANDEZ, ANDRES

7151 Office Cit

Houston, TX 77087

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2021
  • HearingCourt: 061; Docket Type: Law Day Docket; Reason: EXPUNCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: OFFICE OF COURT ADMINISTRATION ATTENTION: E-FILE & RE: SEARCHTX; Issued: 1/19/2021; Tracking: 73832073; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: SOUTHEAST TEXAS CRIME INFORMATION CENTER (SETCIC) BY SERVING; Issued: 1/19/2021; Tracking: 73831263; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY PRETRIAL SERVICES BY SERVING KELVIN L BANKS DIRECTOR; Issued: 1/19/2021; Tracking: 73831262; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: COMMUNITY SUPERVISION & CORRECTIONS BY SERVING DR TERESA MAY PHD; Issued: 1/19/2021; Tracking: 73831260; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY ATTORNEY'S OFFICE BY SERVING RANDALL SMIDT; Issued: 1/19/2021; Tracking: 73831259; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERK'S OFFICE BY SERVING RANDALL SMIDT; Issued: 1/19/2021; Tracking: 73831258; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY CLERK BY SERVING RANDALL SMIDT; Issued: 1/19/2021; Tracking: 73831257; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE BY SERVING BRIAN L. ROSE; Issued: 1/19/2021; Tracking: 73831255; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY BY SERVING EXPUNCTION UNIT; Issued: 1/19/2021; Tracking: 73831254; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT BY SERVING MAJOR MAC MCKELVY; Issued: 1/19/2021; Tracking: 73831253; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HOUSTON POLICE DEPARTMENT BY SERVING DEIDRE HARRIS; Issued: 1/19/2021; Tracking: 73831252; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORDER SIGNED SETTING HEARING; Order Signed: 1/15/2021;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: FERNANDEZ, ANDRES; Person Filing: CASTRO, SILVIA LORENA;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HARRIS COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF COMMUNITY SUPERVISION AND CORRECTIONS is a litigant

Latest cases where SOUTHEAST TEXAS CRIME INFORMATION CENTER (SETCIC) ATTN: EXPUNCTION is a litigant

Latest cases where HARRIS COUNTY ATTORNEY'S OFFICE BY SERVING RANDALL SMIDT is a litigant

Latest cases where COMMUNITY SUPERVISION AND CORRECTIONS BY SERVING DR TERESA MAY PHD is a litigant