This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/24/2015 at 12:13:03 (UTC).

CASTANEDA, ANGELINA vs. PLASCENCIA, JUAN

Case Summary

On 08/30/2004 CASTANEDA, ANGELINA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against PLASCENCIA, JUAN. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****7645

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CASTANEDA, ANGELINA

Defendant

PLASCENCIA, JUAN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/15/2008
  • FOCAS PROJECT - OUT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2007
  • AGREED ORDER OF CONTEMPT SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2007
  • EVIDENCE PRESENTED-NON JURY (EACH DAY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2007
  • JUDGMENT RENDERED BY COURT AFTER TRIAL (NON-JURY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2007
  • NO COSTS ALLOCATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2007
  • TO TRIAL ON MERITS (NON JURY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2007
  • EVIDENCE PRESENTED (BENCH HEARING)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2007
  • RULING MADE - HEARING COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2007
  • BENCH HEARING ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2007
  • REINSTATEMENT ON COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 01/05/2007
  • NO COSTS ALLOCATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2006
  • ORDER SIGNED SETTING HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2006
  • ORDER SIGNED SETTING HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2006
  • MOTION CONTEMPT : Filing Attorney - DOMESTIC RELATIONS OFC,IV-D MONITORING PROGRAM Person Filing - HARRIS COUNTY DOMESTIC RELATIONS OFFICE, IV-D CHILD SUPPORT MONITORING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2004
  • FOCAS PROJECT - IN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2004
  • FINAL JUDGMENT SIGNED FOR PLAINTIFF (NON-JURY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2004
  • ORDER SIGNED GRANTING ASSIGNMENT OF WAGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2004
  • NO COSTS ALLOCATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2004
  • WAIVER CITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2004
  • ORIGINAL PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less