This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 05/14/2023 at 07:20:33 (UTC).

SPRING BRANCH INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT vs. CMC HTG INC (DOING BUSINESS AS CHOONG MAN CHICKEN)

Case Summary

On 04/20/2023 SPRING BRANCH INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against CMC HTG INC DOING BUSINESS AS CHOONG MAN CHICKEN. This case was filed in Harris County District Courthouse, Harris County District Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is CHRISTINE WEEMS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****4874

  • Filing Date:

    04/20/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

CHRISTINE WEEMS

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SPRING BRANCH INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT

CITY OF HOUSTON

Defendants

CMC HTG INC (DOING BUSINESS AS CHOONG MAN CHICKEN)

CHOONG MAN CHICKEN

Other

CMG HTG INC (DOING BUSINESS AS CHOONG MAN CHICKEN) BY SERVING ITS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SONIK, OWEN M.

 

Court Documents

CITATION IN DELINQUENT TAX SUIT

04/20/2023: CITATION IN DELINQUENT TAX SUIT

PLAINTIFFS' ORIGINAL PETITION

04/20/2023: PLAINTIFFS' ORIGINAL PETITION

Citation in Delinquent Tax Suit

05/04/2023: Citation in Delinquent Tax Suit

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2023
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: CMG HTG INC (DOING BUSINESS AS CHOONG MAN CHICKEN) BY SERVING ITS; Issued: 4/20/2023; Served: 5/3/2023; Returned: 5/3/2023; Received: 5/4/2023; Tracking: 74155127; Deliver To: CONSTABLE PCT 1 TAX SUIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2023
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: SONIK, OWEN M.; Person Filing: CITY OF HOUSTON;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2023
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: SONIK, OWEN M.; Person Filing: SPRING BRANCH INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less