This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 12/05/2023 at 02:18:14 (UTC).

KOLOJACO, ROY J vs. INEOS US CHEMICALS COMPANY (F/K/A BP AMOCO CHEMICAL COMPANY F/K/A

Case Summary

On 06/21/2023 KOLOJACO, ROY J filed an Other lawsuit against INEOS US CHEMICALS COMPANY F/K/A BP AMOCO CHEMICAL COMPANY F/K/A. This case was filed in Harris County District Courthouse, Harris County District Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is KRISTEN BRAUCHLE HAWKINS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8311

  • Filing Date:

    06/21/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

KRISTEN BRAUCHLE HAWKINS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KOLOJACO, ROY J

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Others

INEOS US CHEMICALS COMPANY (F/K/A BP AMOCO CHEMICAL COMPANY F/K/A

BP CORPORATION NORTH AMERICA (INDIVIDUALLY AND AS

BP PRODUCTS NORTH AMERCIA INC (F/K/A AMOCO OIL COMPANY AMOCO TEXAS

AMOCO CHEMICAL COMPANY

AMOCO OIL COMPANY

AMOCO PRODUCTION COMPANY

ARCO CHEMICAL COMPANY

ATLANTIC RICHFIELD COMPANY (INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST

BASF CORPORATION

CHEVRON PHILLIPS CHEMICAL COMPANY LP

CHEVRON U S A INC (INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR TO ENTITIES

CONOCOPHILLIPS COMPANY (F/K/A PHILLIPS PETROLEUM COMPANY INDIVIDUALLY

CP CHEM COMPANY LLC (F/K/A CHEVRON PHILLIPS CHEMICAL COMPANY LLC)

CROWN CENTRAL PETROLEUM CORPORATION

EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION (F/K/A EXXON CORPORATION, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS

GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY (THE)

INTERNATIONAL PAPER COMPANY (INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR TO

KRAFT HEINZ FOODS COMPANY (INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST

MARATHON OIL COMPANY (F/K/A USS HOLDINGS COMPANY)

497 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PATRONELLA, MICHAEL BLASE

Defendant Attorneys

TAYLOR, THOMAS W.

JACOBS, KEVIN THOMAS

LEDYARD, DAVID W.

Other Attorneys

COSCULLUELA, ALEX E.

SCARBROUGH, TANYA B.

LYNCH, WALTER GAYLORD

ELLIS, G. JOE

JORDAN, KEVIN MICHAEL

HEYBURN, PAUL RICE

BURNS, DAVID W.

FOLEY, KEITH WILLIAM

OGDEN, TODD DUANE

STUDEBAKER, JENNIFER MARIE

BARRON, BARBARA JANE

DOWDY, MARI BRYN

LAWSON, RODNEY HALL

ELLISTON, GARY D.

BOND, BEVERLY MICHELLE

DODSON, ROBERT EDWIN

38 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Morsey Original Answer

12/04/2023: Morsey Original Answer

Southwestern Industrial Motion to Transfer Venue and Affirmative Defenses

12/04/2023: Southwestern Industrial Motion to Transfer Venue and Affirmative Defenses

Defendant Chevron U.S.A. Inc.'s Original Answer and Answer to Cross Actions

12/04/2023: Defendant Chevron U.S.A. Inc.'s Original Answer and Answer to Cross Actions

Jury Demand

12/04/2023: Jury Demand

Letter

12/01/2023: Letter

Defendant General

12/01/2023: Defendant General

Certificate Of Filing Written Discovery

12/01/2023: Certificate Of Filing Written Discovery

ARMSTRONG PUMPS, INC.S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS ORIGINAL PETITION

12/01/2023: ARMSTRONG PUMPS, INC.S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS ORIGINAL PETITION

DEFENDANT REDCO CORPORATIONS SPECIAL APPEARANCE, AND SUBJECT THERETO, ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS MOST RECENT PETITION, ANSWER TO CROSS ACTIONS AND/OR THIRD PARTY ACTIONS

12/01/2023: DEFENDANT REDCO CORPORATIONS SPECIAL APPEARANCE, AND SUBJECT THERETO, ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS MOST RECENT PETITION, ANSWER TO CROSS ACTIONS AND/OR THIRD PARTY ACTIONS

DEFENDANT, EX-FM, INC. F/K/A FISCHBACH AND MOORE, INCORPORATEDS ORIGINAL ANSWER

12/01/2023: DEFENDANT, EX-FM, INC. F/K/A FISCHBACH AND MOORE, INCORPORATEDS ORIGINAL ANSWER

Defendant Carver Pump Company's Answer To Plaintiff's Original Petition

11/30/2023: Defendant Carver Pump Company's Answer To Plaintiff's Original Petition

Citation Return (Non-Resident Corporate) - Wind Up Ltd

11/30/2023: Citation Return (Non-Resident Corporate) - Wind Up Ltd

Citation Corporate Return - BFI Waste Systems of North America, LLC

11/30/2023: Citation Corporate Return - BFI Waste Systems of North America, LLC

Citation Corporate Return - BO-MAC Contractors, LTD

11/30/2023: Citation Corporate Return - BO-MAC Contractors, LTD

Citation Corporate Return - Browning-Ferris Industries Chemicals Services, Inc

11/30/2023: Citation Corporate Return - Browning-Ferris Industries Chemicals Services, Inc

Citation Corporate Return - Cannon Sline, LLC

11/30/2023: Citation Corporate Return - Cannon Sline, LLC

Citation Corporate Return - CBI Services, LLC

11/30/2023: Citation Corporate Return - CBI Services, LLC

Citation Corporate Return - General Electric Company

11/30/2023: Citation Corporate Return - General Electric Company

246 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

12/04/2023

DocketDescription: JURY DEMAND MADE (TRCP 216);

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/04/2023

DocketDescription: MOTION TRANSFER VENUE; Filing Attorney: FEUILLE, ROBERT RENICK; Person Filing: SOUTHWESTERN INDUSTRIAL CONTRACTORS & RIGGERS INC;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/04/2023

DocketDescription: JURY DEMAND MADE (TRCP 216);

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/04/2023

DocketDescription: JURY DEMAND MADE (TRCP 216);

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/04/2023

DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/04/2023

DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/04/2023

DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: RILEY, TIMOTHY BRADEN; Person Filing: MORSEY CONSTRUCTORS INC;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/04/2023

DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: LEDYARD, DAVID W.; Person Filing: CHEVRON U S A INC (INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR TO ENTITIES;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/04/2023

DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: FEUILLE, ROBERT RENICK; Person Filing: SOUTHWESTERN INDUSTRIAL CONTRACTORS & RIGGERS INC;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/01/2023

DocketDescription: ANSWER; Filing Attorney: MURPHY, MITCHELL MADDOX; Person Filing: REDCO CORPORATION;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
471 More Docket Entries
06/29/2023

DocketType of Service: CITATION (SECRETARY OF STATE CORPORATE NON-RESIDENT); Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: GATX TANK ERECTIONS CORPORATION BY SERVING THE SECRETARY OF; Issued: 7/12/2023; Tracking: 74188910; Deliver To: E-MAIL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/29/2023

DocketType of Service: CITATION (SECRETARY OF STATE CORPORATE NON-RESIDENT); Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: FISHBACH & MOORE INC (A NEW YORK CORPORATION) BY SERVING THE SECRETARY; Issued: 7/12/2023; Tracking: 74188908; Deliver To: E-MAIL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/29/2023

DocketType of Service: CITATION (SECRETARY OF STATE NON-RESIDENT); Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: ECONDYNE CORPORATION BY SERVING THE SECRETARY OF STATE OF TEXAS; Issued: 7/12/2023; Tracking: 74188906; Deliver To: E-MAIL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/29/2023

DocketType of Service: CITATION (SECRETARY OF STATE CORPORATE NON-RESIDENT); Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: CHEMICAL CONSTRUCTION CORP (A DELAWARE CORPORATION) BY SERVING THE; Issued: 7/12/2023; Tracking: 74188897; Deliver To: E-MAIL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/29/2023

DocketType of Service: CITATION (SECRETARY OF STATE CORPORATE NON-RESIDENT); Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: BLUE TEE CORP (A DELAWARE CORPORATION) BY SERVING THE SECRETARY OF; Issued: 7/12/2023; Tracking: 74188882; Deliver To: E-MAIL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/29/2023

DocketType of Service: CITATION (SECRETARY OF STATE CORPORATE NON-RESIDENT); Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: BLUE TEE CORP (A DELAWARE CORPORATION) BY SERVING THE SECRETARY OF; Issued: 7/12/2023; Tracking: 74188882; Deliver To: E-MAIL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/29/2023

DocketType of Service: CITATION (SECRETARY OF STATE CORPORATE NON-RESIDENT); Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: BADGER CO INC (A DELAWARE CORPORATION) BY SERVING THE SECRETARY OF; Issued: 7/12/2023; Tracking: 74188880; Deliver To: E-MAIL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/29/2023

DocketType of Service: CITATION (SECRETARY OF STATE CORPORATE NON-RESIDENT); Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: BADGER CO INC (A DELAWARE CORPORATION) BY SERVING THE SECRETARY OF; Issued: 7/12/2023; Tracking: 74188880; Deliver To: E-MAIL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/21/2023

DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/21/2023

DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: PATRONELLA, MICHAEL BLASE; Person Filing: KOLOJACO, ROY J;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less