This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 09/24/2023 at 07:22:38 (UTC).

GOOSE CREEK CONSOLIDATED INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRI vs. JOJAC/SEJAC LTD

Case Summary

On 08/31/2023 GOOSE CREEK CONSOLIDATED INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRI filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against JOJAC/SEJAC LTD. This case was filed in Harris County District Courthouse, Harris County District Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is RABEEA COLLIER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8482

  • Filing Date:

    08/31/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

RABEEA COLLIER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Intervenor Defendants

GOOSE CREEK CONSOLIDATED INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT

JOJAC/SEJAC LTD

LEE COLLEGE DISTRICT

FEEMSTER, JAMES D

AMY, LAUREL (AKA LAUREL ELIZABETH AMY)

AMY, LAUREL ELIZABETH

AMY, LAUREL ELIZABETH (AKA LAUREL AMY)

AMY, TAYLOR (AKA TAYLOR ELIZABETH AMY)

AMY, TAYLOR ELIZABETH

AMY, TAYLOR ELIZABETH (AKA TAYLOR AMY)

BULLION, SHARON (AKA SHARON KAY BULLION FEEMSTER)

FEEMSTER, SHARON KAY BULLION

FEEMSTER, SHARON KAY BULLION (AKA SHARON BULLION)

BAY OAKS HARBOR PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION (IN REM ONLY)

HARRIS COUNTY

HARRIS COUNTY HOSPITAL DISTRICT

HARRIS COUNTY EDUCATION DEPARTMENT

Intervenor Plaintiff

CITY OF BAYTOWN

Defendants and Intervenor Defendants

JOJAC/SEJAC LTD

LEE COLLEGE DISTRICT

FEEMSTER, JAMES D

AMY, LAUREL (AKA LAUREL ELIZABETH AMY)

AMY, LAUREL ELIZABETH

AMY, LAUREL ELIZABETH (AKA LAUREL AMY)

AMY, TAYLOR (AKA TAYLOR ELIZABETH AMY)

AMY, TAYLOR ELIZABETH

AMY, TAYLOR ELIZABETH (AKA TAYLOR AMY)

BULLION, SHARON (AKA SHARON KAY BULLION FEEMSTER)

FEEMSTER, SHARON KAY BULLION

FEEMSTER, SHARON KAY BULLION (AKA SHARON BULLION)

BAY OAKS HARBOR PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION (IN REM ONLY)

Others

JOJAC/SEJAC LTD BY AND THROUGH ITS REGISTERED AGENT WOODROW A HOLLAND

BAY OAKS HARBOR PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION (IN REM ONLY) BY AND

16 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BENOIT, BRANDON ERIC

Intervenor Plaintiff Attorney

STRONG, RANDALL B.

 

Court Documents

EXHIBIT A

08/31/2023: EXHIBIT A

CIVIL PROCESS REQUEST

08/31/2023: CIVIL PROCESS REQUEST

CITATION

08/31/2023: CITATION

CITATION

08/31/2023: CITATION

CITATION

08/31/2023: CITATION

CITATION

08/31/2023: CITATION

CITATION

08/31/2023: CITATION

CITATION

08/31/2023: CITATION

PLAINTIFFS ORIGINAL PETITION

08/31/2023: PLAINTIFFS ORIGINAL PETITION

Exhibit B

09/13/2023: Exhibit B

Exhibit A

09/13/2023: Exhibit A

Intervenor's Original Petition

09/13/2023: Intervenor's Original Petition

Citation

09/14/2023: Citation

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

09/13/2023

DocketDescription: INTERVENTION; Filing Attorney: STRONG, RANDALL B.; Person Filing: CITY OF BAYTOWN;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2023

DocketDescription: INTERVENTION; Filing Attorney: STRONG, RANDALL B.; Person Filing: BAYTOWN PUBLIC IMPROVEMENT DISTRICT NUMBER ONE;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/31/2023

DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: BAY OAKS HARBOR PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION (IN REM ONLY) BY AND; Issued: 9/5/2023; Served: 9/11/2023; Returned: 9/12/2023; Tracking: 74219486; Deliver To: CONSTABLE PCT 1 TAX SUIT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/31/2023

DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: BULLION, SHARON (AKA SHARON KAY BULLION FEEMSTER); Issued: 9/5/2023; Tracking: 74219485; Deliver To: MAIL TO ATTORNEY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/31/2023

DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: AMY, TAYLOR (AKA TAYLOR ELIZABETH AMY); Issued: 9/5/2023; Tracking: 74219484; Deliver To: MAIL TO ATTORNEY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/31/2023

DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: AMY, LAUREL (AKA LAUREL ELIZABETH AMY); Issued: 9/5/2023; Tracking: 74219483; Deliver To: MAIL TO ATTORNEY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/31/2023

DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: FEEMSTER, JAMES D; Issued: 9/5/2023; Tracking: 74219482; Deliver To: MAIL TO ATTORNEY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/31/2023

DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: JOJAC/SEJAC LTD BY AND THROUGH ITS REGISTERED AGENT WOODROW A HOLLAND; Issued: 9/5/2023; Tracking: 74219481; Deliver To: CONSTABLE PCT 1 TAX SUIT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/31/2023

DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: BENOIT, BRANDON ERIC; Person Filing: GOOSE CREEK CONSOLIDATED INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less