This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 05/14/2023 at 07:18:38 (UTC).

RUIZ, JASMINE vs. SOLIS, DAYSI

Case Summary

On 04/20/2023 RUIZ, JASMINE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against SOLIS, DAYSI. This case was filed in Harris County District Courthouse, Harris County District Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is URSULA A. HALL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****4841

  • Filing Date:

    04/20/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

URSULA A. HALL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RUIZ, JASMINE

Defendants

SOLIS, DAYSI

GALLEGOS, JASON M

GELCO FLEET TRUST

Other

GELCO FLEET TRUST BY SERVING THROUGH ITS REGISTERED AGENT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PIERCE, MICHAEL ELTON

 

Court Documents

Request for Issuance of Service

04/20/2023: Request for Issuance of Service

Exhibit A

04/20/2023: Exhibit A

Plaintiff's Original Petition

04/20/2023: Plaintiff's Original Petition

Return of Service - Gelco Fleet Trust

05/02/2023: Return of Service - Gelco Fleet Trust

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2023
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: GELCO FLEET TRUST BY SERVING THROUGH ITS REGISTERED AGENT; Issued: 4/20/2023; Served: 5/2/2023; Received: 5/2/2023; Tracking: 74155049; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2023
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: GALLEGOS, JASON M; Issued: 4/20/2023; Tracking: 74155047; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2023
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: SOLIS, DAYSI; Issued: 4/20/2023; Tracking: 74155045; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2023
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: PIERCE, MICHAEL ELTON; Person Filing: RUIZ, JASMINE;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less