This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 11/23/2023 at 06:52:56 (UTC).

SOUTHWESTERN BELL TELEPHONE COMPANY D/B/A AT&T TEX vs. DIGCO UTILITY CONSTRUCTION, L.P.

Case Summary

On 09/19/2023 SOUTHWESTERN BELL TELEPHONE COMPANY D/B/A AT T TEX filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against DIGCO UTILITY CONSTRUCTION, L P. This case was filed in Harris County District Courthouse, Harris County District Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is LAUREN REEDER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****3817

  • Filing Date:

    09/19/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

LAUREN REEDER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SOUTHWESTERN BELL TELEPHONE COMPANY D/B/A AT&T TEX

Defendant

DIGCO UTILITY CONSTRUCTION, L.P.

Other

DIGCO UTILITY CONSTRUCTION LP BY SERVING ITS REGISTERED AGENT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

OBREGON, RENE LUIS

Defendant Attorney

FAIRLESS, RANDY LYNN

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SERVICE

09/19/2023: REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SERVICE

Plaintiff's Original Petition

09/19/2023: Plaintiff's Original Petition

Citation (executed) - DIGCO UTILITY CONSTRUCTION LP

09/29/2023: Citation (executed) - DIGCO UTILITY CONSTRUCTION LP

DEFENDANT'S ORIGINAL ANSWER

10/16/2023: DEFENDANT'S ORIGINAL ANSWER

DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED

10/26/2023: DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED

Certificate of Written Discovery

11/15/2023: Certificate of Written Discovery

 

Docket Entries

10/21/2024

HearingCourt: 234; Docket Type: Trial Setting; Reason: TRIAL ON MERITS (MOTION FOR)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/26/2023

DocketDescription: DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED; Order Signed: 10/26/2023;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/26/2023

DocketDescription: DESIGNATED TRIAL READY;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/16/2023

DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: FAIRLESS, RANDY LYNN; Person Filing: DIGCO UTILITY CONSTRUCTION, L.P.;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/16/2023

DocketDescription: JURY DEMAND MADE (TRCP 216);

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/16/2023

DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/19/2023

DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: DIGCO UTILITY CONSTRUCTION LP BY SERVING ITS REGISTERED AGENT; Issued: 9/20/2023; Served: 9/22/2023; Tracking: 74227462; Deliver To: E-MAIL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/19/2023

DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: OBREGON, RENE LUIS; Person Filing: SOUTHWESTERN BELL TELEPHONE COMPANY D/B/A AT&T TEX;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less