This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 05/21/2023 at 07:21:09 (UTC).

GOOSE CREEK CONSOLIDATED INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRI vs. GABRIEL, YAMMINE Y (DDS PA) (AKA Y GABRIEL YAMMINE

Case Summary

On 04/27/2023 GOOSE CREEK CONSOLIDATED INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRI filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against GABRIEL, YAMMINE Y DDS PA AKA Y GABRIEL YAMMINE. This case was filed in Harris County District Courthouse, Harris County District Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is LATOSHA LEWIS PAYNE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****6369

  • Filing Date:

    04/27/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

LATOSHA LEWIS PAYNE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GOOSE CREEK CONSOLIDATED INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT

Defendants

GABRIEL, YAMMINE Y (DDS PA) (AKA Y GABRIEL YAMMINE D D S P A) (A

YAMMINE, Y GABRIEL D D S

Other

GABRIEL, YAMMINE Y DDS PA (AKA Y GABRIEL YAMMINE D D S P A) (A TEXAS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BENOIT, BRANDON ERIC

 

Court Documents

Exhibit A

04/27/2023: Exhibit A

Civil Process Request

04/27/2023: Civil Process Request

Citation

04/27/2023: Citation

PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION

04/27/2023: PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION

Citation

05/10/2023: Citation

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/27/2023
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: GABRIEL, YAMMINE Y DDS PA (AKA Y GABRIEL YAMMINE D D S P A) (A TEXAS; Issued: 4/28/2023; Served: 5/9/2023; Returned: 5/9/2023; Tracking: 74159561; Deliver To: CONSTABLE PCT 1 TAX SUIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2023
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: BENOIT, BRANDON ERIC; Person Filing: GOOSE CREEK CONSOLIDATED INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less