This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 05/10/2023 at 04:11:39 (UTC).

BJ SERVICES LLC vs. CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYD S LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO POLICY NO

Case Summary

On 05/05/2023 BJ SERVICES LLC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYD S LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO POLICY NO. This case was filed in Harris County District Courthouse, Harris County District Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is DEDRA DAVIS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8178

  • Filing Date:

    05/05/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

DEDRA DAVIS

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BJ SERVICES LLC

GACP FINANCE CO LLC (AGENT)

Defendants

CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO POLICY NO

LLOYDS SYNDICATE 2987 - BRT

LLOYDS SYNDICATE 457 - MRS

LLOYDS SYNDICATE 4711 - ASP

LLOYDS SYNDICATE 1919 - CVS

LLOYDS SYNDICATE 2001 - AML

LLOYDS SYNDICATE 3000 - MKL

LLOYDS SYNDICATE 1969 - APL

LLOYDS SYNDICATE 33 - HIS

LLOYDS SYNDICATE 1955 - BAR

LLOYDS SYNDICATE 1274 - AUL

LLOYDS SYNDICATE 1200 - AMA

LLOYDS SYNDICATE 510 - TMK

LLOYDS SYNDICATE 1084 - CSL

LLOYDS SYNDICATE 1183 - TAL

LANCASHIRE INSURANCE

STARNET INSURANCE COMPANY

HUDSON SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

17 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COOPER, J. JAMES

 

Court Documents

Letter to Clerk

05/08/2023: Letter to Clerk

Request for Issuance of Service

05/08/2023: Request for Issuance of Service

Request for Issuance of Service

05/08/2023: Request for Issuance of Service

Request for Issuance of Service

05/08/2023: Request for Issuance of Service

Request for Issuance of Service

05/08/2023: Request for Issuance of Service

Request for Issuance of Service

05/08/2023: Request for Issuance of Service

Request for Issuance of Service

05/08/2023: Request for Issuance of Service

Request for Issuance of Service

05/08/2023: Request for Issuance of Service

Request for Issuance of Service

05/08/2023: Request for Issuance of Service

Request for Issuance of Service

05/08/2023: Request for Issuance of Service

Request for Issuance of Service

05/08/2023: Request for Issuance of Service

Request for Issuance of Service

05/08/2023: Request for Issuance of Service

Request for Issuance of Service

05/08/2023: Request for Issuance of Service

Request for Issuance of Service

05/08/2023: Request for Issuance of Service

Request for Issuance of Service

05/08/2023: Request for Issuance of Service

Request for Issuance of Service

05/08/2023: Request for Issuance of Service

Request for Issuance of Service

05/08/2023: Request for Issuance of Service

Request for Issuance of Service

05/08/2023: Request for Issuance of Service

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

05/09/2023

DocketType of Service: CITATION (INSURANCE COMMISSION); Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: LLOYDS SYNDICATE 1919 - CVS MAY BE SERVED WITH PROCESS THROUGH; Issued: 5/9/2023; Tracking: 74164225; Deliver To: E-MAIL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/08/2023

DocketType of Service: CITATION (INSURANCE COMMISSION); Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HUDSON SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY MAY BE SERVED WITH PROCESS THROUGH; Issued: 5/9/2023; Tracking: 74164244; Deliver To: E-MAIL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/08/2023

DocketType of Service: CITATION (INSURANCE COMMISSION); Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: STARNET INSURANCE COMPANY MAY BE SERVED WITH PROCESS THROUGH; Issued: 5/9/2023; Tracking: 74164243; Deliver To: E-MAIL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/08/2023

DocketType of Service: CITATION (INSURANCE COMMISSION); Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: LANCASHIRE INSURANCE MAY BE SERVED WITH PROCESS THROUGH; Issued: 5/9/2023; Tracking: 74164241; Deliver To: E-MAIL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/08/2023

DocketType of Service: CITATION (INSURANCE COMMISSION); Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: LLOYDS SYNDICATE 1183 - TAL MAY BE SERVED WITH PROCESS THROUGH; Issued: 5/9/2023; Tracking: 74164240; Deliver To: E-MAIL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/08/2023

DocketType of Service: CITATION (INSURANCE COMMISSION); Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: LLOYDS SYNDICATE 1084 - CSL MAY BE SERVED WITH PROCESS THROUGH; Issued: 5/9/2023; Tracking: 74164239; Deliver To: E-MAIL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/08/2023

DocketType of Service: CITATION (INSURANCE COMMISSION); Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: LLOYDS SYNDICATE 510 - TMK MAY BE SERVED WITH PROCESS THROUGH; Issued: 5/9/2023; Tracking: 74164236; Deliver To: E-MAIL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/08/2023

DocketType of Service: CITATION (INSURANCE COMMISSION); Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: LLOYDS SYNDICATE 1200 - AMA MAY BE SERVED WITH PROCESS THROUGH; Issued: 5/9/2023; Tracking: 74164235; Deliver To: E-MAIL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/08/2023

DocketType of Service: CITATION (INSURANCE COMMISSION); Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: LLOYDS SYNDICATE 1274 - AUL MAY BE SERVED WITH PROCESS THROUGH; Issued: 5/9/2023; Tracking: 74164234; Deliver To: E-MAIL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/08/2023

DocketType of Service: CITATION (INSURANCE COMMISSION); Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: LLOYDS SYNDICATE 1955 - BAR MAY BE SERVED WITH PROCESS THROUGH; Issued: 5/9/2023; Tracking: 74164233; Deliver To: E-MAIL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/08/2023

DocketType of Service: CITATION (INSURANCE COMMISSION); Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: LLOYDS SYNDICATE 33 - HIS MAY BE SERVED WITH PROCESS THROUGH; Issued: 5/9/2023; Tracking: 74164232; Deliver To: E-MAIL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/08/2023

DocketType of Service: CITATION (INSURANCE COMMISSION); Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: LLOYDS SYNDICATE 1969 - APL MAY BE SERVED WITH PROCESS THROUGH; Issued: 5/9/2023; Tracking: 74164230; Deliver To: E-MAIL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/08/2023

DocketType of Service: CITATION (INSURANCE COMMISSION); Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: LLOYDS SYNDICATE 3000 - MKL MAY BE SERVED WITH PROCESS THROUGH; Issued: 5/9/2023; Tracking: 74164229; Deliver To: E-MAIL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/08/2023

DocketType of Service: CITATION (INSURANCE COMMISSION); Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: LLOYDS SYNDICATE 2001 - AML MAY BE SERVED WITH PROCESS THROUGH; Issued: 5/9/2023; Tracking: 74164227; Deliver To: E-MAIL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/08/2023

DocketType of Service: CITATION (INSURANCE COMMISSION); Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: LLOYDS SYNDICATE 4711 - ASP MAY BE SERVED WITH PROCESS THROUGH; Issued: 5/9/2023; Tracking: 74164222; Deliver To: E-MAIL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/08/2023

DocketType of Service: CITATION (INSURANCE COMMISSION); Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: LLOYDS SYNDICATE 457 - MRS MAY BE SERVED WITH PROCESS THROUGH; Issued: 5/9/2023; Tracking: 74164221; Deliver To: E-MAIL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/08/2023

DocketType of Service: CITATION (INSURANCE COMMISSION); Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: LLOYDS SYNDICATE 2987 - BRT MAY BE SERVED WITH PROCESS THROUGH; Issued: 5/9/2023; Tracking: 74164213; Deliver To: E-MAIL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/05/2023

DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: COOPER, J. JAMES; Person Filing: GACP FINANCE CO LLC (AGENT);

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/05/2023

DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: COOPER, J. JAMES; Person Filing: BJ SERVICES LLC;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less