This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 05/21/2023 at 07:32:04 (UTC).

GOOSE CREEK CONSOLIDATED INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRI vs. VASQUEZ, CHRISTIAN D

Case Summary

On 04/27/2023 GOOSE CREEK CONSOLIDATED INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRI filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against VASQUEZ, CHRISTIAN D. This case was filed in Harris County District Courthouse, Harris County District Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is ELAINE H PALMER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****6548

  • Filing Date:

    04/27/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

ELAINE H PALMER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GOOSE CREEK CONSOLIDATED INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT

LEE COLLEGE DISTRICT

Defendants

VASQUEZ, CHRISTIAN D

HARRIS COUNTY

HARRIS COUNTY HOSPITAL DISTRICT

HARRIS COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION

PORT OF HOUSTON AUTHORITY OF HARRIS COUNTY

HARRIS COUNTY FLOOD CONTROL DISTRICT

HARRIS COUNTY FRESH WATER SERVICE DISTRICT NO 1A

HARRIS COUNTY EMERGENCY SERVICE DISTRICT NO 75

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BENOIT, BRANDON ERIC

 

Court Documents

LETTER

04/27/2023: LETTER

EXHIBIT A

04/27/2023: EXHIBIT A

CIVIL PROCESS REQUEST

04/27/2023: CIVIL PROCESS REQUEST

CITATION IN DELINQUENT TAX SUIT

04/27/2023: CITATION IN DELINQUENT TAX SUIT

PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION

04/27/2023: PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION

Citation

05/10/2023: Citation

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/27/2023
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: VASQUEZ, CHRISTIAN D; Issued: 4/28/2023; Served: 5/8/2023; Returned: 5/8/2023; Received: 5/10/2023; Tracking: 74159301; Deliver To: CONSTABLE PCT 1 TAX SUIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2023
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: BENOIT, BRANDON ERIC; Person Filing: LEE COLLEGE DISTRICT;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2023
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: BENOIT, BRANDON ERIC; Person Filing: GOOSE CREEK CONSOLIDATED INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less