This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/15/2023 at 08:03:13 (UTC).

KLIBERT, SUSAN vs. PORTIS, LAVESTER

Case Summary

On 05/22/2023 KLIBERT, SUSAN filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against PORTIS, LAVESTER. This case was filed in Harris County District Courthouse, Harris County District Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is BEAU MILLER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1829

  • Filing Date:

    05/22/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

BEAU MILLER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KLIBERT, SUSAN

Defendants

PORTIS, LAVESTER

RANDALLS FOOD MARKETS INC

RANDALLS FOOD & DRUGS LP

ALBERTSONS LLC

SAFEWAY INC

Others

RANDALLS FOOD MARKETS INC (A FOR PROFIT CORPORATION) BY SERVING THROUG

RANDALLS FOOD AND DRUGS LP BY SERVING THROUGH THE

ALBERTSONS LLC BY SERVING THROUGH THE TEXAS SECRETARY OF STATE

SAFEWAY INC BY SERVING THROUGH THE TEXAS SECRETARY OF STATE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

OESCH, BRADFORD NEAL

 

Court Documents

PLAINTIFFS ORIGINAL PETITION AND REQUEST FOR INITIAL DISCLOSURES

05/22/2023: PLAINTIFFS ORIGINAL PETITION AND REQUEST FOR INITIAL DISCLOSURES

Request for Issuance of Service

05/24/2023: Request for Issuance of Service

Request for Issuance of Service

05/24/2023: Request for Issuance of Service

Request for Issuance of Service

05/24/2023: Request for Issuance of Service

Request for Issuance of Service

05/24/2023: Request for Issuance of Service

Request for Issuance of Service

05/24/2023: Request for Issuance of Service

Return of Service

05/26/2023: Return of Service

Certified Mail Receipt

05/25/2023: Certified Mail Receipt

Certified Mail Receipt

05/25/2023: Certified Mail Receipt

Certified Mail Receipt

05/25/2023: Certified Mail Receipt

Certified Mail Receipt

05/25/2023: Certified Mail Receipt

Certified Mail Tracking Number 7020 0640 0001 1363 5569

05/25/2023: Certified Mail Tracking Number 7020 0640 0001 1363 5569

Certified Mail Tracking Number 7020 0640 0001 1363 5590

05/25/2023: Certified Mail Tracking Number 7020 0640 0001 1363 5590

Certified Mail Tracking Number 7020 0640 0001 1363 5583

05/25/2023: Certified Mail Tracking Number 7020 0640 0001 1363 5583

Certified Mail Tracking Number 7020 0640 0001 1363 5576

05/25/2023: Certified Mail Tracking Number 7020 0640 0001 1363 5576

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2023
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (SECRETARY OF STATE); Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: SAFEWAY INC BY SERVING THROUGH THE TEXAS SECRETARY OF STATE; Issued: 5/25/2023; Served: 6/8/2023; Tracking: 74172742; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (SECRETARY OF STATE); Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: ALBERTSONS LLC BY SERVING THROUGH THE TEXAS SECRETARY OF STATE; Issued: 5/25/2023; Served: 5/30/2023; Tracking: 74172739; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (SECRETARY OF STATE); Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: RANDALLS FOOD AND DRUGS LP BY SERVING THROUGH THE; Issued: 5/25/2023; Served: 5/30/2023; Tracking: 74172736; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (SECRETARY OF STATE); Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: RANDALLS FOOD MARKETS INC (A FOR PROFIT CORPORATION) BY SERVING THROUG; Issued: 5/25/2023; Served: 5/30/2023; Tracking: 74172720; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: PORTIS, LAVESTER; Issued: 5/24/2023; Served: 5/26/2023; Received: 5/26/2023; Tracking: 74172681; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: OESCH, BRADFORD NEAL; Person Filing: KLIBERT, SUSAN;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less