This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 05/22/2023 at 07:23:46 (UTC).

GOOSE CREEK CONSOLIDATED ISD AND LEE COLLEGE DISTR vs. LUNA, DOROTEO JR WHOSE LOCATION IS UNKNOWN AND

Case Summary

On 04/28/2023 GOOSE CREEK CONSOLIDATED ISD AND LEE COLLEGE DISTR filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against LUNA, DOROTEO JR WHOSE LOCATION IS UNKNOWN AND. This case was filed in Harris County District Courthouse, Harris County District Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is DONNA ROTH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****6716

  • Filing Date:

    04/28/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

DONNA ROTH

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GOOSE CREEK CONSOLIDATED ISD AND LEE COLLEGE DISTRICT

LEE JR COLLEGE DISTRICT

Intervenor Plaintiff

CITY OF BAYTOWN

Defendants and Intervenor Defendants

LUNA, DOROTEO JR WHOSE LOCATION IS UNKNOWN AND

LUNA, DOROTEO (IV)

LUNA, JUAN ANGEL

LUNA, JOSE LUIS

LUNA, JESUS ELIAZAR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BENOIT, BRANDON ERIC

Intervenor Plaintiff Attorney

STRONG, RANDALL B.

 

Court Documents

Letter Requesting Service

04/28/2023: Letter Requesting Service

Exhibit A

04/28/2023: Exhibit A

Civil Process Request

04/28/2023: Civil Process Request

CITATION

04/28/2023: CITATION

CITATION

04/28/2023: CITATION

CITATION

04/28/2023: CITATION

CITATION

04/28/2023: CITATION

PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION

04/28/2023: PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION

Citation

05/10/2023: Citation

Luna Exhibit C

05/17/2023: Luna Exhibit C

Luna Exhibit B

05/17/2023: Luna Exhibit B

Luna Exhibit A

05/17/2023: Luna Exhibit A

Intervenors Original Petition

05/17/2023: Intervenors Original Petition

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2023
  • DocketDescription: INTERVENTION; Filing Attorney: STRONG, RANDALL B.; Person Filing: CITY OF BAYTOWN;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: LUNA, JESUS ELIAZAR; Issued: 5/1/2023; Served: 5/8/2023; Returned: 5/8/2023; Tracking: 74160002; Deliver To: CONSTABLE PCT 1 TAX SUIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: LUNA, JOSE LUIS; Issued: 5/1/2023; Tracking: 74159997; Deliver To: MAIL TO ATTORNEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: LUNA, JUAN ANGEL; Issued: 5/1/2023; Served: 5/11/2023; Returned: 5/11/2023; Tracking: 74159993; Deliver To: CONSTABLE PCT 1 TAX SUIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: LUNA, DOROTEO (IV); Issued: 5/1/2023; Tracking: 74159991; Deliver To: MAIL TO ATTORNEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: BENOIT, BRANDON ERIC; Person Filing: LEE JR COLLEGE DISTRICT;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: BENOIT, BRANDON ERIC; Person Filing: GOOSE CREEK CONSOLIDATED ISD AND LEE COLLEGE DISTRICT;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less