This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 12/09/2022 at 07:24:37 (UTC).

CARTER, ROCHUNDA MICHELLE vs. OFFICE OF COURT ADMINISTRATION

Case Summary

On 11/15/2022 CARTER, ROCHUNDA MICHELLE filed an Other - Expungement lawsuit against OFFICE OF COURT ADMINISTRATION. This case was filed in Harris County District Courthouse, Harris County District Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is RAVI K. SANDILL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****5145

  • Filing Date:

    11/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Expungement

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

RAVI K. SANDILL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CARTER, ROCHUNDA MICHELLE

Defendants

OFFICE OF COURT ADMINISTRATION

TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF CRIMINAL JUSTICE ??? CJAD

TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY

HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE

HARRIS COUNTY CSCD

HARRIS COUNTY PRETRIAL SERVICES

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERK'S OFFICE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/06/2023
  • HearingCourt: 127; Docket Type: Law Day Docket; Reason: EXPUNCTION (MOTION FOR)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF CRIMINAL JUSTICE ??? CJAD; Issued: 11/23/2022; Tracking: 74081562; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Issued: 11/23/2022; Tracking: 74081555; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Issued: 11/23/2022; Tracking: 74081553; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Issued: 11/23/2022; Tracking: 74081552; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Issued: 11/23/2022; Tracking: 74081551; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Issued: 11/23/2022; Tracking: 74081550; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Issued: 11/23/2022; Tracking: 74081549; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Issued: 11/23/2022; Tracking: 74081547; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORDER SIGNED SETTING HEARING; Order Signed: 11/16/2022;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person Filing: CARTER, ROCHUNDA MICHELLE;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HARRIS COUNTY CSCD is a litigant

Latest cases where Texas Department of Criminal Justice - Parole Division is a litigant

Latest cases where OFFICE OF COURT ADMINISTRATION - LEGAL DIVISION is a litigant