This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/24/2015 at 11:29:56 (UTC).

CARRION, LUPE vs. CARRION, DEBORAH PATRICIA O'KELLY

Case Summary

On 08/30/2004 CARRION, LUPE filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against CARRION, DEBORAH PATRICIA O'KELLY. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****6343

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CARRION, LUPE

Defendant

CARRION, DEBORAH PATRICIA O'KELLY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CLARK, ROBERT S.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2005
  • FINAL JUDGMENT SIGNED FOR PLAINTIFF (NON-JURY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2005
  • EACH PAY OWN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2005
  • REINSTATEMENT ON COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2005
  • MOTION TO REINSTATE GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2005
  • NO COSTS ALLOCATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2005
  • DISMISSED FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2004
  • ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO ANOTHER DISTRICT COURT SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2004
  • TRANSFERRED TO HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2004
  • TRANSFERRED TO ANOTHER HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2004
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - CLARK, ROBERT S. Person Filing - CARRION, LUPE

    Read MoreRead Less