This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/24/2015 at 12:07:29 (UTC).

CARRILLO, JUAN vs. DECHILLO, CHRISTOPHER

Case Summary

On 08/30/2004 CARRILLO, JUAN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against DECHILLO, CHRISTOPHER. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****7545

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CARRILLO, JUAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MUNSON, BRUCE ANDREW

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/07/2005
  • EACH PAY OWN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2005
  • DISMISSED ON AGREEMENT OF PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2005
  • ORDER SIGNED GRANTING ENTRY OF TEMPORARY ORDERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2005
  • MOTION TO DISCOVER DENIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2005
  • MOTION FOR TRIAL CONTINUANCE DENIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2005
  • TRIAL RECESSED TO FUTURE DATE (NON-JURY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2005
  • CONTINUED AS NON-JURY BEFORE JURY SWORN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2005
  • TO TRIAL ON MERITS (JURY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2005
  • TRIAL ACTIVITY NO TESTIMONY HEARD (JURY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2005
  • SECOND AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - MUNSON, BRUCE ANDREW Person Filing - CARRILLO, JUAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2005
  • FIRST AMENDED ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - SPECTOR, MAUREEN MCPHERSON Person Filing - DECHILLO, CHRISTOPHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2005
  • ORDER SIGNED GRANTNG PARTIAL TRIAL CONTINUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2005
  • ORDER SIGNED GRANTING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2005
  • DESIGNATED TRIAL READY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2005
  • DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2004
  • JURY DEMAND MADE (TRCP 216)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2004
  • JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2004
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - RHODES, ERIC LAMONT Person Filing - DECHILLO, CHRISTOPHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2004
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - MUNSON, BRUCE ANDREW Person Filing - CARRILLO, JUAN

    Read MoreRead Less