This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 09/12/2021 at 07:28:32 (UTC).

CARMOUCHE, FELTON vs. BLUERIDGE TRANSPORTATION GROUP LLC

Case Summary

On 08/19/2021 CARMOUCHE, FELTON filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against BLUERIDGE TRANSPORTATION GROUP LLC. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is CHRISTINE WEEMS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1673

  • Filing Date:

    08/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

CHRISTINE WEEMS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CARMOUCHE, FELTON

Defendants

BLUERIDGE TRANSPORTATION GROUP LLC

ALMEDA GENOA CONSTRUCTORS JV

DRAGADOS USA INC

PULICE CONSTRUCTION INC

SHIKUN & BINUI AMERICA INC

Others

BLUERIDGE TRANSPORTATION GROUP LLC (CORPORATION) MAY BE SERVED BY ITS

1999 Bryan Street Suite 900

Dallas, TX 75201

ALMEDA GENOA CONSTRUCTORS JV (CORPORATION) MAY BE SERVED BY ITS

3010 Bellfort Avenue

Houston, TX 77051

DRAGADOS USA INC (FOREIGN CORPORATION) MAY BE SERVED BY ITS

211 E 7Th Street Suite 620

Austin, TX 78701

PULICE CONSTRUCTION INC (FOREIGN CORPORATION) MAY BE SERVED BY ITS

211 E 7Th Street Suite 620

Austin, TX 78701

SHIKUN & BINUI AMERICA INC (FOREIGN CORPORATION) MAY BE SERVED BY ITS

3010 Belfort Avenue

Houston, TX 77051

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BURKHALTER, JAMES DAVID

 

Court Documents

Request for issuances of service

08/19/2021: Request for issuances of service

Request for issuance of service

08/19/2021: Request for issuance of service

Request for issuance of service

08/19/2021: Request for issuance of service

Request for issuance of service

08/19/2021: Request for issuance of service

Request for issuance of service

08/19/2021: Request for issuance of service

21.8.19 - Plaintiff's Original Petition

08/19/2021: 21.8.19 - Plaintiff's Original Petition

Return of Service-BLUERIDGE TRANSPORTATION GROUP LLC

08/23/2021: Return of Service-BLUERIDGE TRANSPORTATION GROUP LLC

Return of Service-SHIKUN & BINUI AMERICA INC

08/27/2021: Return of Service-SHIKUN & BINUI AMERICA INC

Return of Service-ALMEDA GENOA CONSTRUCTORS JV

08/27/2021: Return of Service-ALMEDA GENOA CONSTRUCTORS JV

Return of Service-PULICE CONSTRUCTION INC

09/02/2021: Return of Service-PULICE CONSTRUCTION INC

Citation Corporate

09/02/2021: Citation Corporate

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION CORPORATE; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: BLUERIDGE TRANSPORTATION GROUP LLC (CORPORATION) MAY BE SERVED BY ITS; Issued: 8/19/2021; Served: 8/20/2021; Received: 8/24/2021; Tracking: 73904090; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION CORPORATE; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: ALMEDA GENOA CONSTRUCTORS JV (CORPORATION) MAY BE SERVED BY ITS; Issued: 8/19/2021; Tracking: 73904089; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION CORPORATE; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: ALMEDA GENOA CONSTRUCTORS JV (CORPORATION) MAY BE SERVED BY ITS; Issued: 8/19/2021; Tracking: 73904089; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION CORPORATE; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: DRAGADOS USA INC (FOREIGN CORPORATION) MAY BE SERVED BY ITS; Issued: 8/19/2021; Served: 8/25/2021; Tracking: 73904088; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION CORPORATE; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: PULICE CONSTRUCTION INC (FOREIGN CORPORATION) MAY BE SERVED BY ITS; Issued: 8/19/2021; Served: 8/25/2021; Received: 9/7/2021; Tracking: 73904085; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION CORPORATE; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: SHIKUN & BINUI AMERICA INC (FOREIGN CORPORATION) MAY BE SERVED BY ITS; Issued: 8/19/2021; Served: 8/25/2021; Received: 8/27/2021; Tracking: 73904084; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: BURKHALTER, JAMES DAVID; Person Filing: CARMOUCHE, FELTON;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Pulice Construction Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Dragados USA, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Burkhalter, James D