This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 03/21/2019 at 07:53:36 (UTC).

CAO, ANGELA vs. SELENE FINANCE LP

Case Summary

On 02/25/2019 CAO, ANGELA filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against SELENE FINANCE LP. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is R K SANDILL. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****4662

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

R K SANDILL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAO, ANGELA

Houston, TX 77007

Defendants

SELENE FINANCE LP

MTGLQ INVESTORS LP

Others

SELENE FINANCE L P (FOREIGN LIMITED PARTNERSHIP) MAY BE SERVED THROUGH

1999 Bryan Street Suite 900

Dallas, TX 75201-3136

MTGLQ INVESTORS LP MAY BE SERVED THROUGH ITS REGISTERED AGENT CT

Dallas, TX 75201-3136

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

HORD, MICHAEL F. JR.

1415 Louisiana

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

Defendants' Notice of Filing Removal

03/04/2019: Defendants' Notice of Filing Removal

Defendants' Original Answer

03/04/2019: Defendants' Original Answer

Request for Issuance of Service

03/04/2019: Request for Issuance of Service

Letter to Clerk

03/04/2019: Letter to Clerk

Plaintiff's Motion to Extend Temporary Restraining Order and Request to Reset Temporary Injunction Hearing

03/05/2019: Plaintiff's Motion to Extend Temporary Restraining Order and Request to Reset Temporary Injunction Hearing

Civil Process Pick-Up Form

03/07/2019: Civil Process Pick-Up Form

Proposed Temporary Restraining Order

02/25/2019: Proposed Temporary Restraining Order

EXHIBIT 10

02/25/2019: EXHIBIT 10

EXHIBIT 08

02/25/2019: EXHIBIT 08

EXHIBIT 07

02/25/2019: EXHIBIT 07

EXHIBIT 06

02/25/2019: EXHIBIT 06

EXHIBIT 04

02/25/2019: EXHIBIT 04

EXHIBIT 03

02/25/2019: EXHIBIT 03

EXHIBIT 02

02/25/2019: EXHIBIT 02

EXHIBIT 01

02/25/2019: EXHIBIT 01

AFFIDAVIT

02/25/2019: AFFIDAVIT

Plaintiffs Original Petition, Application for Temporary Restraining Order, Temporary Injunction, Permanent Injunction & Request for Disclosure

02/25/2019: Plaintiffs Original Petition, Application for Temporary Restraining Order, Temporary Injunction, Permanent Injunction & Request for Disclosure

Clerks certificate of cash deposit in lieu of injunction bond per order of the court

02/28/2019: Clerks certificate of cash deposit in lieu of injunction bond per order of the court

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2019
  • Description: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: HORD, MICHAEL F. JR.; Person Filing: SELENE FINANCE LP;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • Description: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: HORD, MICHAEL F. JR.; Person Filing: MTGLQ INVESTORS LP;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • Description: REMOVED TO FEDERAL COURT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • Description: ORDER SETTING BOND SIGNED; Order Signed: 2/28/2019;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • Description: ORDER SIGNED SETTING HEARING; Order Signed: 2/28/2019;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • Description: APPEARANCE ON TEMPORARY INJ OR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORD;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • Description: ORDER SIGNED GRANTING TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER; Order Signed: 2/28/2019;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • Description: MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER GRANTED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • Description: APPEARANCE ON TEMPORARY INJ OR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORD;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • Description: MTN FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER HEARD, NO RULING MADE;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • Description: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person Filing: CAO, ANGELA;

    Read MoreRead Less