Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 07/18/2020 at 07:17:16 (UTC).

CANTU, ANTONIO vs. INEOS OLEFINS & POLYMERS USA (A DIVISION OF INEOS USA LLC)

Case Summary

On 06/24/2020 CANTU, ANTONIO filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against INEOS OLEFINS POLYMERS USA A DIVISION OF INEOS USA LLC. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is LATOSHA LEWIS PAYNE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****7743

  • Filing Date:

    06/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

LATOSHA LEWIS PAYNE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CANTU, ANTONIO

Defendants

ELECTRA LINK INC

INEOS OLEFINS & POLYMERS USA (A DIVISION OF INEOS USA LLC)

INEOS USA LLC

Others

ELECTRA LINK INC (A TEXAS DOMESTIC CORPORATION) MAY BE SERVED THROUGH

21755 I-45 Building 10

Spring, TX 77388

INEOS USA LLC MAY BE SERVED THROUGH ITS REGISTERED AGENT

Dallas, TX 75201

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BUZBEE, ANTHONY

Defendant Attorney

DELUCA, BRADLEY L.

 

Court Documents

Request for Issuance of Service

06/24/2020: Request for Issuance of Service

Request for Issuance of Service

06/24/2020: Request for Issuance of Service

PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION

06/24/2020: PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION

Affidavit of Service

06/29/2020: Affidavit of Service

Affidavit of Service

06/30/2020: Affidavit of Service

Defendants Ineos Olffins & Polymers USA, A Division of Ineos USA LLC and Electria Link Inc.'s Original Answer and Request for Disclosure

07/17/2020: Defendants Ineos Olffins & Polymers USA, A Division of Ineos USA LLC and Electria Link Inc.'s Original Answer and Request for Disclosure

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/17/2020
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: DELUCA, BRADLEY L.; Person Filing: INEOS USA LLC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: DELUCA, BRADLEY L.; Person Filing: ELECTRA LINK INC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: DELUCA, BRADLEY L.; Person Filing: INEOS OLEFINS & POLYMERS USA (A DIVISION OF INEOS USA LLC);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION CORPORATE; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: ELECTRA LINK INC (A TEXAS DOMESTIC CORPORATION) MAY BE SERVED THROUGH; Issued: 6/24/2020; Served: 6/26/2020; Tracking: 73760811; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: INEOS USA LLC MAY BE SERVED THROUGH ITS REGISTERED AGENT; Issued: 6/24/2020; Served: 6/26/2020; Tracking: 73760808; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: BUZBEE, ANTHONY; Person Filing: CANTU, ANTONIO;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where INEOS USA LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Electra Link Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BUZBEE, ANTHONY GLENN