Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 05/02/2021 at 07:33:11 (UTC).

CANOPIUS US INSURANCE INC vs. KERR KARR INC

Case Summary

On 04/08/2021 CANOPIUS US INSURANCE INC filed an Other lawsuit against KERR KARR INC. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is SCOT DOLLINGER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0803

  • Filing Date:

    04/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

SCOT DOLLINGER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CANOPIUS US INSURANCE INC

Defendants

BUDGET TRUCK RENTAL LLC

MARSHALL, KRISTEN

Bryan, TX 77801

SMITH, TERRY

AVIS BUDGET GROUP INC

MCMURRY, TRAJARVIS

KERR KARR INC

PALMER, BERNARD

Bryan, TX 77801

CENTRE POINTE FUNDING LLC

Others

KERR KARR INC (A TEXAS CORPORATION) BY SERVING ITS REGISTERED AGENT

6911 Fm 1488 Ste F

Magnolia, TX 77354

CENTRE POINTE FUNDING LLC (A DELAWARE CORPORATION) BY SERVING ITS

701 Brazos St Suite 1050

Austin, TX 78701

BUDGET TRUCK RENTAL LLC (A DELAWARE CORPORATION) BY SERVING ITS

701 Brazos St Suite 1050

Austin, TX 78701

AVIS BUDGET GROUP INC (A DELAWARE CORPORATION) BY SERVING ITS

100 Charles Ewing Blvd Suite 160

Ewing, NJ 08628

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PICKETT, LESLIE DEAN

 

Court Documents

return of citation service

04/20/2021: return of citation service

return of citation service

04/20/2021: return of citation service

return of citation service

04/20/2021: return of citation service

return of citation service

04/26/2021: return of citation service

Plaintiff's Original Petition for Declaratory Judgment

04/08/2021: Plaintiff's Original Petition for Declaratory Judgment

Request for Issuance of Service

04/09/2021: Request for Issuance of Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: PALMER, BERNARD; Issued: 4/14/2021; Tracking: 73860451; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: MARSHALL, KRISTEN; Issued: 4/14/2021; Tracking: 73860450; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (NON-RESIDENT CORPORATE); Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: AVIS BUDGET GROUP INC (A DELAWARE CORPORATION) BY SERVING ITS; Issued: 4/14/2021; Served: 4/19/2021; Tracking: 73860445; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION CORPORATE; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: BUDGET TRUCK RENTAL LLC (A DELAWARE CORPORATION) BY SERVING ITS; Issued: 4/14/2021; Tracking: 73860443; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION CORPORATE; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: CENTRE POINTE FUNDING LLC (A DELAWARE CORPORATION) BY SERVING ITS; Issued: 4/14/2021; Tracking: 73860440; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION CORPORATE; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: KERR KARR INC (A TEXAS CORPORATION) BY SERVING ITS REGISTERED AGENT; Issued: 4/14/2021; Tracking: 73860439; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: PICKETT, LESLIE DEAN; Person Filing: CANOPIUS US INSURANCE INC;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BUDGET TRUCK RENTAL LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where CANOPIUS US INSURANCE INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where AVIS / BUDGET GROUP INC A CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PICKETT LESLIE DEAN