This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/24/2015 at 12:04:41 (UTC).

CAMP, LOUISE (IND AND AS PERSONAL REPRES vs. A W CHESTERTON CO

Case Summary

On 08/30/2004 CAMP, LOUISE IND AND AS PERSONAL REPRES filed an Other - Complex Tort/Class Action lawsuit against A W CHESTERTON CO. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****7535

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Complex Tort/Class Action

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Defendants

CAMP, LOUISE (IND AND AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE HEIRS AND

SPRY, RICHARD (IND AND AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE HEIRS AND

AMERICAN STANDARD INC

GEORGIA-PACIFIC CORPORATION (IND AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO

KELLY-MOORE PAINT COMPANY INC

METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY

WARREN PUMPS INC (CORPORATION)

ELLIOTT TURBOMACHINERY CO INC

CROWN CORK & SEAL COMPANY INC

YEOMANS CHICAGO CORPORATION

CAMP, MABEL LOUIS (INDIVIDUALLY AND AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE

AQUA-CHEM INC (DBA CLEAVER-BROOKS DIVISION) (CORPORATION)

CLEAVER-BROOKS DIVISION

BABCOCK BORSIG POWER INC (FKA D B RILEY INC FKA RILEY STOKER

D B RILEY INC

RILEY STOKER CORPORATION

BUFFALO PUMPS INC (CORPORATION)

CRANE COMPANY

CROWN CORK AND SEAL COMPANY INC (IND AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO

DANA CORPORATION

53 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

DU PLESSIS, REIKA B.

OLD, JAMES ROWLAND JR.

BAILEY, MELVIN DAVID

WADE, TODD N.

RHODES, KENNETH D.

THACKSTON, ROBERT EDWIN

GIBSON, SHANNON GAYLE

STUART, KIMBERLY ROSE

WHITE, CLAY M.

POWERS, JAMES H.

RAMIREZ, MICHAEL JOHN

Other Attorneys

HARDING, LISA D.

FOLEY, KEITH WILLIAM

FRASE, LAURA ANN

LOFTIN, STEPHEN MCBRIDE

HENDRYX, MICHAEL

SPAIN, H. DANIEL

NEBEL, ROGER

POWELL, LISA A.

FARRELL, WILLIAM HOWARD

9 More Attorneys Available

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/12/2015
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2013
  • PARTIAL REMOVAL TO BANKRUPTCY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2013
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2011
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2011
  • FIRST AMENDED ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - LEDYARD, DAVID W. Person Filing - CHEVRON U S A INC (FKA STANDARD OIL COMPANY OF CALIFORNIA U S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2011
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2010
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2010
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2010
  • SETTLEMENT ANNOUNCED NOT ON RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2010
  • HOLD FOR JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
189 More Docket Entries
  • 11/05/2004
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - PUTONTI, JESSICA A. Person Filing - COOPER INDUSTRIES INC (OHIO CORPORATION) (IND AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2004
  • ANSWER CROSS ACTION : Filing Attorney - COLE, RYAN GRANT Person Filing - IMO INDUSTRIES INC (IND AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO DE LAVAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2004
  • ANSWER ALL CROSS ACTION : Filing Attorney - POWELL, LISA A. Person Filing - ABLE SUPPLY COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2004
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - POWELL, LISA A. Person Filing - ABLE SUPPLY COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2004
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - SMITH, J. MARK Person Filing - CAMP, LOUISE (IND AND AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE HEIRS AND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2004
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - SMITH, J. MARK Person Filing - GAFFNEY, EARNESTINE (IND AND AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE HEIRS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2004
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - SMITH, J. MARK Person Filing - SPRY, RICHARD (IND AND AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE HEIRS AND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2004
  • JURY DEMAND MADE (TRCP 216)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2004
  • JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2000
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - COLE, RYAN GRANT Person Filing - IMO INDUSTRIES INC (IND AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO DE LAVAL

    Read MoreRead Less