This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 11/25/2021 at 07:37:26 (UTC).

CAMP, DAVID vs. HOUSTON FIRST HOLDINGS LLC (INDIVIDUALLY AND DBA HILTON

Case Summary

On 11/01/2021 CAMP, DAVID filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against HOUSTON FIRST HOLDINGS LLC INDIVIDUALLY AND DBA HILTON. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is ELAINE H PALMER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1949

  • Filing Date:

    11/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

ELAINE H PALMER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CAMP, DAVID

WESTERDAHL, MEGAN

Defendants

HOUSTON FIRST HOLDINGS LLC (INDIVIDUALLY AND DBA HILTON

HILTON WORLDWIDE INC

HILTON AMERICAS-HOUSTON

HOUSTON FIRST HOLDINGS LLC (INCORRECTLY NAMED AS

Others

HOUSTON FIRST HOLDINGS LLC (INDIVIDUALLY AND DBA HILTON AMERICAS-

701 Avenida De Las Americas Suite 200

Houston, TX 77010

HILTON WORLDWIDE INC (A FOREIGN CORPORATION) MAY BE SERVED BY

211 E 7Th St Ste 620

Austin, TX 78701

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEAL, JOSHUA R.

Defendant Attorney

HOLLOWAY, GREGORY ARTHUR

 

Court Documents

Return of Service

11/04/2021: Return of Service

Plaintiff's Original Petition

11/01/2021: Plaintiff's Original Petition

Request for Issuance of Service

11/01/2021: Request for Issuance of Service

Request for Issuance of Service

11/01/2021: Request for Issuance of Service

DEFENDANTS ORIGINAL ANSWER

11/24/2021: DEFENDANTS ORIGINAL ANSWER

Return of Service

11/10/2021: Return of Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: HOLLOWAY, GREGORY ARTHUR; Person Filing: HOUSTON FIRST HOLDINGS LLC (INCORRECTLY NAMED AS;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: HOLLOWAY, GREGORY ARTHUR; Person Filing: HOUSTON FIRST HOLDINGS LLC (INDIVIDUALLY AND DBA HILTON;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: HOLLOWAY, GREGORY ARTHUR; Person Filing: HILTON AMERICAS-HOUSTON;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION CORPORATE; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HILTON WORLDWIDE INC (A FOREIGN CORPORATION) MAY BE SERVED BY; Issued: 11/3/2021; Served: 11/9/2021; Tracking: 73934554; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HOUSTON FIRST HOLDINGS LLC (INDIVIDUALLY AND DBA HILTON AMERICAS-; Issued: 11/3/2021; Tracking: 73934553; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: LEAL, JOSHUA R.; Person Filing: CAMP, DAVID;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: LEAL, JOSHUA R.; Person Filing: WESTERDAHL, MEGAN;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HILTON WORLDWIDE HOLDINGS INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HOLLOWAY, GREGORY A.