Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/12/2020 at 11:33:20 (UTC).

CAMDEN PARK HOMEOWNERS' ASSOCIATION vs. ARELLANO, JOSE L

Case Summary

On 03/26/2020 CAMDEN PARK HOMEOWNERS' ASSOCIATION filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against ARELLANO, JOSE L. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is STEVEN KIRKLAND. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****9419

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

STEVEN KIRKLAND

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAMDEN PARK HOMEOWNERS' ASSOCIATION

Defendant

ARELLANO, JOSE L

Houston, TX 77067

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FARINE, TRISHA TAYLOR

 

Court Documents

Notice Of Submission (FDJU 6.29.20):

06/03/2020: Notice Of Submission (FDJU 6.29.20):

Proposed Default Judgment

06/03/2020: Proposed Default Judgment

Exhibit G

06/03/2020: Exhibit G

Exhibit E

06/03/2020: Exhibit E

Exhibit D

06/03/2020: Exhibit D

Exhibit C

06/03/2020: Exhibit C

Exhibit B

06/03/2020: Exhibit B

Exhibit A

06/03/2020: Exhibit A

Motion For Default Judgment

06/03/2020: Motion For Default Judgment

CITATION: ARELLANO, JOSE L:

04/01/2020: CITATION: ARELLANO, JOSE L:

Request For Issuance of Service

03/26/2020: Request For Issuance of Service

PLAINTIFF'S CERTIFICATE OF WRITTEN DISCOVERY

03/26/2020: PLAINTIFF'S CERTIFICATE OF WRITTEN DISCOVERY

Exibit C. POP

03/26/2020: Exibit C. POP

Exhibit F. POP PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO JOSE L ARELLANO

03/26/2020: Exhibit F. POP PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO JOSE L ARELLANO

Exhibit E. POP PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSION TO JOSE L ARELLANO

03/26/2020: Exhibit E. POP PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSION TO JOSE L ARELLANO

Exhibit B - POP

03/26/2020: Exhibit B - POP

Exhibit A. POP

03/26/2020: Exhibit A. POP

PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION AND DISCOVERY

03/26/2020: PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION AND DISCOVERY

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/29/2020
  • HearingCourt: 334; Docket Type: Submission Docket (Local Rule 12); Reason: DEFAULT - MOTION FOR (TRCP 239); Requesting Party: FARINE, TRISHA TAYLOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: ARELLANO, JOSE L; Issued: 3/27/2020; Served: 3/28/2020; Tracking: 73738564; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: FARINE, TRISHA TAYLOR; Person Filing: CAMDEN PARK HOMEOWNERS' ASSOCIATION;

    Read MoreRead Less