This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 10/09/2022 at 07:39:42 (UTC).

CAIRE, JEAN RENE vs. OFFICE OF COURT ADMINISTRATION

Case Summary

On 09/15/2022 CAIRE, JEAN RENE filed an Other - Expungement lawsuit against OFFICE OF COURT ADMINISTRATION. This case was filed in Harris County District Courthouse, Harris County District Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is JERALYNN MANOR. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8988

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Expungement

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

JERALYNN MANOR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAIRE, JEAN RENE

Defendants

OFFICE OF COURT ADMINISTRATION

HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE

HARRIS COUNTY CSCD

HARRIS COUNTY PRETRIAL SERVICES

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERK'S OFFICE

HARRIS COUNTY INSTITUTE OF FORENSIC SCIENCES

1861 Old Spanish Trail,

Houston, TX 77030

TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF CRIMINAL JUSTICE- CJAD

209 W.14Th Street Suite, 400

Austin, TX 78701

TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY CRIME RECORDS DIVISION/EXPUNCTIONS

Others

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERK'S OFFICE BY SERVING

1310 Prairie Ste 880

Houston, TX 77002

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE BY SERVING

1310 Prairie 5Th Floor

Houston, TX 77002

HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT BY SERVING

1200 Baker Street

Houston, TX 77011

HARRIS COUNTY PRETRIAL SERVICES BY SERVING

102 San Jacinto

Houston, TX 77002

HARRIS COUNTY COMMUNIITY SUPERVISION & CORRECTIONS BY SERVING

49 San Jacinto

Houston, TX 77002

OFFICE OF COURT ADMINISTRATION BY SERVING

205 W. 14Th Street Ste 600

Austin, TX 78701

TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY BY SERVING EXPUNCTION UNIT

Po Box 4143

Austin, TX 78765

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/07/2022
  • HearingCourt: 080; Docket Type: Law Day Docket; Reason: EXPUNCTION (MOTION FOR)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF CRIMINAL JUSTICE- CJAD; Issued: 10/3/2022; Tracking: 74059659; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CERTIFIED MAIL BY CONSTABLE; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY INSTITUTE OF FORENSIC SCIENCES; Issued: 10/3/2022; Tracking: 74059658; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY BY SERVING EXPUNCTION UNIT; Issued: 10/3/2022; Tracking: 74053976; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: OFFICE OF COURT ADMINISTRATION BY SERVING; Issued: 10/3/2022; Tracking: 74053975; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY COMMUNIITY SUPERVISION & CORRECTIONS BY SERVING; Issued: 10/3/2022; Tracking: 74053974; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY PRETRIAL SERVICES BY SERVING; Issued: 10/3/2022; Tracking: 74053973; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT BY SERVING; Issued: 10/3/2022; Tracking: 74053969; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE BY SERVING; Issued: 10/3/2022; Tracking: 74053968; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERK'S OFFICE BY SERVING; Issued: 10/3/2022; Tracking: 74053967; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORDER SIGNED SETTING HEARING; Order Signed: 9/19/2022;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person Filing: CAIRE, JEAN RENE;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HARRIS COUNTY INSTITUTE OF FORENSIC SCIENCES is a litigant

Latest cases where HARRIS COUNTY COMMUNITY SUPERVISION AND CORRECTIONS DEPARMENT is a litigant

Latest cases where HARRIS COUNTY CSCD is a litigant

Latest cases where Texas Department of Criminal Justice - Parole Division is a litigant