This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 07/06/2015 at 00:07:12 (UTC).

BUTCHER, BRITTANY LEANN vs. BUTCHER, BENJAMIN ODELL

Case Summary

On 01/05/2005 BUTCHER, BRITTANY LEANN filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against BUTCHER, BENJAMIN ODELL. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0379

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2005

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BUTCHER, BRITTANY LEANN

Defendant

BUTCHER, BENJAMIN ODELL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DAVIS, EDWARD A. III

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/25/2005
  • CERTIFIED COPY OF WAIVER ORDER MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2005
  • FINAL JUDGMENT SIGNED FOR PLAINTIFF (NON-JURY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2005
  • EACH PAY OWN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2005
  • WAIVER CITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2005
  • ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO ANOTHER DISTRICT COURT SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2005
  • TRANSFERRED TO HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2005
  • TRANSFERRED TO ANOTHER HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2005
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - DAVIS, EDWARD A. III Person Filing - BUTCHER, BRITTANY LEANN

    Read MoreRead Less