This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 09/16/2021 at 07:17:25 (UTC).

BUSHNELL, DIANA (INDIVIDUALLY AND AS NEXT FRIEND OF JOSEPH BUSHNELL) vs. CHI ST LUKE S HEALTH BAYLOR ST LUKE S MEDICAL CENTER

Case Summary

On 08/23/2021 BUSHNELL, DIANA INDIVIDUALLY AND AS NEXT FRIEND OF JOSEPH BUSHNELL filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against CHI ST LUKE S HEALTH BAYLOR ST LUKE S MEDICAL CENTER. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is RABEEA COLLIER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2414

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

RABEEA COLLIER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BUSHNELL, DIANA (INDIVIDUALLY AND AS NEXT FRIEND OF JOSEPH BUSHNELL)

BUSHNELL, JOSEPH

Defendants

CHI ST LUKES HEALTH BAYLOR ST LUKES MEDICAL CENTER

ST LUKE'S HEALTH SYSTEM CORPORATION

CHI ST LUKES HEALTH BAYLOR COLLEGE OF MEDICINE MEDICAL CENTER

CHI ST LUKE'S MEDICAL CENTER

Others

CHI ST LUKES HEALTH BAYLOR ST LUKES MEDICAL CENTER (A TEXAS

1999 Bryan Street Suite 900

Dallas, TX 75201

CHI ST LUKES HEALTH BAYLOR COLLEGE OF MEDICINE MEDICAL CENTER (A

1999 Bryan Street Suite 900

Dallas, TX 75201

ST LUKES HEALTH SYSTEM CORPORATION (A DOMESTIC NONPROFIT CORPORATION)

1999 Bryan Street Suite 900

Dallas, TX 75201

CHI ST LUKES MEDICAL CENTER MAY BE SERVED BY SERVING ITS REGISTERED

1999 Bryan Street Suite 900

Dallas, TX 75201

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

HOLCOMB, JAMES ANDREW

HOLCOMB, JAMES A.

 

Court Documents

Plaintiffs' Original Petition

08/23/2021: Plaintiffs' Original Petition

Exhibit A

08/23/2021: Exhibit A

Exhibit B

08/23/2021: Exhibit B

Request for Issuance of Service

08/23/2021: Request for Issuance of Service

Request for Issuance of Service

08/23/2021: Request for Issuance of Service

Request for Issuance of Service

08/23/2021: Request for Issuance of Service

Request for Issuance of Service

08/23/2021: Request for Issuance of Service

Return of Service

09/02/2021: Return of Service

Return of Service

09/02/2021: Return of Service

Citation Corporate

09/02/2021: Citation Corporate

Citation Corporate

09/02/2021: Citation Corporate

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: CHI ST LUKES MEDICAL CENTER MAY BE SERVED BY SERVING ITS REGISTERED; Issued: 8/26/2021; Served: 9/1/2021; Received: 9/2/2021; Tracking: 73906946; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION CORPORATE; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: ST LUKES HEALTH SYSTEM CORPORATION (A DOMESTIC NONPROFIT CORPORATION); Issued: 8/26/2021; Served: 9/1/2021; Received: 9/2/2021; Tracking: 73906941; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION CORPORATE; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: CHI ST LUKES HEALTH BAYLOR COLLEGE OF MEDICINE MEDICAL CENTER (A; Issued: 8/26/2021; Served: 9/1/2021; Received: 9/2/2021; Tracking: 73906934; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION CORPORATE; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: CHI ST LUKES HEALTH BAYLOR ST LUKES MEDICAL CENTER (A TEXAS; Issued: 8/26/2021; Served: 9/1/2021; Received: 9/2/2021; Tracking: 73906932; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: HOLCOMB, JAMES A.; Person Filing: BUSHNELL, JOSEPH;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: HOLCOMB, JAMES A.; Person Filing: BUSHNELL, DIANA (INDIVIDUALLY AND AS NEXT FRIEND OF JOSEPH BUSHNELL);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ST LUKE'S HEALTH SYSTEM CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where CHI ST. LUKE'S HEALTH BAYLOR COLLEGE is a litigant