This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 05/06/2022 at 07:33:55 (UTC).

BUSH, KHRISTINA D. vs. HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

Case Summary

On 04/12/2022 BUSH, KHRISTINA D filed an Other - Expungement lawsuit against HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE. This case was filed in Harris County District Courthouse, Harris County District Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is DEDRA DAVIS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2226

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Expungement

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

DEDRA DAVIS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BUSH, KHRISTINA D.

Defendants

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERK

HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT

HARRIS COUNTY JAIL

TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY

TDCJ-CJAD

209 W. 14Th Street,

Austin, TX 78701

NCIC/TCIC

Others

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEYS OFFICE BY SERVING BRIAN ROSE

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERKS OFFICE BY SERVING RANDALL SMIDT

HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFFS DEPARTMENT BY SERVING MAJOR MAC MCKELVY

HARRIS COUNTY JAIL SERVING MAJOR MAC MCKELVY

TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY EXPUNCTION UNIT

NCIC/TCIC EXPUNCTION UNIT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BELL, BRANDON R

Defendant Attorney

SCOTT, MEAGAN THERESE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: BELL, BRANDON R; Person Filing: BUSH, KHRISTINA D.;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: SCOTT, MEAGAN THERESE; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: TDCJ-CJAD; Issued: 4/27/2022; Tracking: 74000107; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: SENSITIVE DATA DOCUMENT; Order Signed: 4/13/2022;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORDER SIGNED SETTING HEARING; Order Signed: 4/13/2022;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: BELL, BRANDON R; Person Filing: BUSH, KHRISTINA D.;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NCIC/TCIC is a litigant

Latest cases where TDCJ-CJAD is a litigant

Latest cases where HARRIS COUNTY JAIL BY SERVING MAJOR MAC MCKELVY is a litigant

Latest cases where HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT is a litigant