This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/18/2015 at 23:22:57 (UTC).

BUILDERS EQUIPMENT AND TOOL COMPANY (DBA vs. CHUTES INTENATIONAL MANUFACUTURING LLC

Case Summary

On 12/02/2004 BUILDERS EQUIPMENT AND TOOL COMPANY DBA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CHUTES INTENATIONAL MANUFACUTURING LLC. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8577

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Defendants

BUILDERS EQUIPMENT AND TOOL COMPANY (DBA BETCO SCAFFOLDS)

BETCO SCAFFOLDS

TDR SYSTEMS INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

MAYFIELD, DEBRA IBARRA

MASON, JESS WAYNE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2006
  • NO COSTS ALLOCATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2006
  • ORDER OF NON-SUIT SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2006
  • HOLD FOR JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2006
  • ORDER SIGNED COMPELLING PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2006
  • MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2006
  • ORDER SIGNED GRANTING TRIAL CONTINUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2006
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - MAYFIELD, DEBRA IBARRA Person Filing - BUILDERS EQUIPMENT AND TOOL COMPANY (DBA BETCO SCAFFOLDS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2006
  • COUNTER CLAIM : Filing Attorney - MASON, JESS WAYNE Person Filing - TDR SYSTEMS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2005
  • ORDER SIGNED GRANTING TRIAL CONTINUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2005
  • ORDER OF PARTIAL NONSUIT SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 09/19/2005
  • JURY DEMAND MADE (TRCP 216)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2005
  • FIRST AMENDED ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - MASON, JESS WAYNE Person Filing - TDR SYSTEMS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2005
  • DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - MASON, JESS WAYNE Person Filing - TDR SYSTEMS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - MASON, JESS WAYNE Person Filing - CHUTES INTENATIONAL MANUFACUTURING LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2005
  • FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - MAYFIELD, DEBRA IBARRA Person Filing - BUILDERS EQUIPMENT AND TOOL COMPANY (DBA BETCO SCAFFOLDS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2005
  • FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - MAYFIELD, DEBRA IBARRA Person Filing - BETCO SCAFFOLDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2005
  • SPECIAL APPEARANCE : Filing Attorney - BAGLEY, JUDITH WORTH Person Filing - CHUTES INTENATIONAL MANUFACUTURING LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2004
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - MAYFIELD, DEBRA IBARRA Person Filing - BETCO SCAFFOLDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2004
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - MAYFIELD, DEBRA IBARRA Person Filing - BUILDERS EQUIPMENT AND TOOL COMPANY (DBA BETCO SCAFFOLDS)

    Read MoreRead Less