This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/18/2015 at 23:21:27 (UTC).

BU, HUI-FANG vs. THOMAS, JACQUELENE

Case Summary

On 12/02/2004 BU, HUI-FANG filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against THOMAS, JACQUELENE. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8560

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Defendants

BU, HUI-FANG

ZHOU, ZHENG (IND & AS REPRESENTATIVE OF THE ESTATE OF PU-FU ZHOU)

BOUSQUET & JACKSON P C

THOMAS, JACQUELENE

THOMAS, JAMES D

OHNESORGE, ROBERT W

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

OHNESORGE, ROBERT WAYNE

BOUSQUET, THOMAS G.

Defendant Attorney

SHAVER, JEFFERY J

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/20/2006
  • NO COSTS ALLOCATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2006
  • ORDER OF NON-SUIT SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2006
  • ORDER FOR INTERLOCUTORY SUMMARY JUDGMENT SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2006
  • ORDER SIGNED GRANTING TRIAL CONTINUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2006
  • DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2006
  • FOURTH AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - MCENIRY, KERRY R Person Filing - ZHOU, ZHENG (IND & AS REPRESENTATIVE OF THE ESTATE OF PU-FU ZHOU)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2006
  • FOURTH AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - MCENIRY, KERRY R Person Filing - BU, HUI-FANG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2006
  • FIRST AMENDED ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - SHAVER, JEFFERY J Person Filing - THOMAS, JAMES D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2006
  • FIRST AMENDED ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - SHAVER, JEFFERY J Person Filing - THOMAS, JACQUELENE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2006
  • THIRD AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - MCENIRY, KERRY R Person Filing - BU, HUI-FANG

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 04/25/2005
  • ANSWER FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - BOUSQUET, THOMAS G. Person Filing - BOUSQUET & JACKSON P C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2005
  • COUNTER CLAIM : Filing Attorney - BOUSQUET, THOMAS G. Person Filing - ZHOU, ZHENG (IND & AS REPRESENTATIVE OF THE ESTATE OF PU-FU ZHOU)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2005
  • COUNTER CLAIM : Filing Attorney - BOUSQUET, THOMAS G. Person Filing - BOUSQUET & JACKSON P C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2005
  • FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - OHNESORGE, ROBERT WAYNE Person Filing - ZHOU, ZHENG (IND & AS REPRESENTATIVE OF THE ESTATE OF PU-FU ZHOU)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2005
  • FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - OHNESORGE, ROBERT WAYNE Person Filing - BU, HUI-FANG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2005
  • JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - OWEN, SCOTT M. Person Filing - THOMAS, JAMES D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - OWEN, SCOTT M. Person Filing - THOMAS, JACQUELENE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2004
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - OHNESORGE, ROBERT WAYNE Person Filing - BU, HUI-FANG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2004
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - OHNESORGE, ROBERT WAYNE Person Filing - ZHOU, ZHENG (IND & AS REPRESENTATIVE OF THE ESTATE OF PU-FU ZHOU)

    Read MoreRead Less