This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 07/06/2015 at 00:03:51 (UTC).

BRUNGARDT, AMIE BOWEN vs. BRUNGARDT, BRIAN BARLOW

Case Summary

On 01/05/2005 BRUNGARDT, AMIE BOWEN filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against BRUNGARDT, BRIAN BARLOW. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0358

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2005

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BRUNGARDT, AMIE BOWEN

Defendants

BRUNGARDT, BRIAN BARLOW

BRUNDGARDT, BRIAN BARLOW

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NGUYEN, LAN TUYET

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/06/2006
  • ORDER ISSUING CAPIAS SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2006
  • ORDER SIGNED GRANTING AGREEMENT PER RULE 11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2006
  • NO COSTS ALLOCATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2006
  • AGREED ORDER OF CONTEMPT SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2006
  • ORDER OF RELEASE FROM JAIL SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2005
  • ORDER ISSUING CAPIAS SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2005
  • ORDER SIGNED SETTING HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2005
  • MOTION TO ENFORCE (FAMILY) : Filing Attorney - NGUYEN, LAN TUYET Person Filing - PARKER, AMIE BOWEN (FKA AMIE B BRUNGARDT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2005
  • ORDER SIGNED CHANGING NAME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2005
  • AGREED JUDGMENT, ORDER SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 05/20/2005
  • FOCAS PROJECT - IN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2005
  • ORDER SIGNED GRANTING ASSIGNMENT OF WAGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2005
  • ORDER SGND GRNTG QUALIFIED MEDICAL CHILD SUPPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2005
  • ORDER SIGNED COMPELLING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2005
  • ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2005
  • TEMPORARY ORDER SIGNED WITH CHILDREN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2005
  • FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - NGUYEN, LAN TUYET Person Filing - BRUNGARDT, AMIE BOWEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2005
  • ORDER SIGNED GRANTING TEMPORARY INJUNCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2005
  • WAIVER CITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2005
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - NGUYEN, LAN TUYET Person Filing - BRUNGARDT, AMIE BOWEN

    Read MoreRead Less