This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 08/22/2020 at 07:49:35 (UTC).

BROWN, WILLIAM B vs. JOHN CRANE INC

Case Summary

On 07/29/2020 BROWN, WILLIAM B filed an Other lawsuit against JOHN CRANE INC. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is KRISTEN BRAUCHLE HAWKINS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****5132

  • Filing Date:

    07/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

KRISTEN BRAUCHLE HAWKINS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BROWN, SALLY

Defendants

PHILLIPS 66 COMPANY

LAMONS GASKET COMPANY (SUED INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-BY-MERGER TO

ELLIOTT TURBOMACHINERY COMPANY

MONSANTO COMPANY

SEQUOIA VENTURES INC (F/K/A BECHTEL CORPORATION)

TRANSOCEAN DRILLING U K LIMITED (F/K/A

VIACOM INC (F/K/A CBS CORPORATION)

PFIZER INC

THE DURIRON COMPANY INC.SUED AS SCCESSOR-BY-MERGER

WARREN PUMPS LLC

BP CORPORATION NORTH AMERICA INC (F/K/A AMOCO CORPORATION)

FLOWSERVE US INC (SUED AS SUCCESSOR TO

SEMBCORP HOLDINGS LLC (SUED INDIVIDUALLY

JOHN CRANE INC

ETHYL CORPORATION

E I DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY

A W CHESTERTON COMPANY

EXXON MOBILE CORPORATION

ELLIOTT COMPANY (F/K/A AND D/B/A ELLIOTT

35 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCDOWELL, DARREN PATRICK

Defendant Attorneys

SKAGGS, JERAMY MITCHELL

GOLDEN, SHAWN DAVID

Other Attorneys

MARSHALL, HOLLINGSWORTH BARRET JR.

 

Court Documents

Lamons Gasket Company's Original Answer to Plaintiffs' First Amended Petition and Jury Demand

07/31/2020: Lamons Gasket Company's Original Answer to Plaintiffs' First Amended Petition and Jury Demand

Notice Of Hearing Motion To Consolidate

08/10/2020: Notice Of Hearing Motion To Consolidate

Propossed Order on Motion-to-Consolidate Cases

08/10/2020: Propossed Order on Motion-to-Consolidate Cases

Motion to Consolidate Cases

08/10/2020: Motion to Consolidate Cases

Affidavit of Service

08/13/2020: Affidavit of Service

Defendant Cleaver-Brook,s INC'S Special Appearance, Subject Thereto, Special Exceptions, Answer To Plaintiffs' First Amended Petition, Affirmative Defenses, Cross-Claim and Answer To Cross-Claims

08/14/2020: Defendant Cleaver-Brook,s INC'S Special Appearance, Subject Thereto, Special Exceptions, Answer To Plaintiffs' First Amended Petition, Affirmative Defenses, Cross-Claim and Answer To Cross-Claims

Exhibit B

07/29/2020: Exhibit B

Exhibit A

07/29/2020: Exhibit A

Notice of Transfer Under Rule 13 of Tag-Along Case

07/29/2020: Notice of Transfer Under Rule 13 of Tag-Along Case

Clerk Certificate

07/29/2020: Clerk Certificate

Plaintiff's Original Petition and Jury Demand

07/29/2020: Plaintiff's Original Petition and Jury Demand

Civil Case Information Sheet

07/29/2020: Civil Case Information Sheet

Process Request Form

07/29/2020: Process Request Form

Email to Fears Nachawati PLLC with three citations attached

07/29/2020: Email to Fears Nachawati PLLC with three citations attached

Email to Fears Nachawati PLLC with three citations attached 2

07/29/2020: Email to Fears Nachawati PLLC with three citations attached 2

Email from The District Clerk's Office with 2 citations attached

07/29/2020: Email from The District Clerk's Office with 2 citations attached

Email from The District Clerk's Office to jiola@fnlawfirm.com with 9 citations attached

07/29/2020: Email from The District Clerk's Office to jiola@fnlawfirm.com with 9 citations attached

Email from The District Clerk's Office with 1 citation attached

07/29/2020: Email from The District Clerk's Office with 1 citation attached

121 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/14/2020
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: MARSHALL, HOLLINGSWORTH BARRET JR.; Person Filing: CLEAVER-BROOKS, INC., F/K/A AQUA-CHEM, INC. D/B/A CLEAVER;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER FIRST AMENDED PETITION; Filing Attorney: SKAGGS, JERAMY MITCHELL; Person Filing: LAMONS GASKET COMPANY (SUED INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-BY-MERGER TO;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: SKAGGS, JERAMY MITCHELL; Person Filing: LAMONS GASKET COMPANY (SUED INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-BY-MERGER TO;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: GOLDEN, SHAWN DAVID; Person Filing: PFIZER INC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: MCDOWELL, DARREN PATRICK; Person Filing: BROWN, WILLIAM B;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: MCDOWELL, DARREN PATRICK; Person Filing: BROWN, SALLY;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PHILLIPS 66 COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where LAMONS GASKET COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where WARREN PUMPS INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Ethyl Corporation is a litigant