This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/18/2021 at 07:35:47 (UTC).

BROWN, RACHEL MAYA (AKA JOHNNYRAY DIXON BROWN) vs. HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFFS OFFICE

Case Summary

On 05/25/2021 BROWN, RACHEL MAYA AKA JOHNNYRAY DIXON BROWN filed an Other - Expungement lawsuit against HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFFS OFFICE. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is KRISTEN BRAUCHLE HAWKINS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1246

  • Filing Date:

    05/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Expungement

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

KRISTEN BRAUCHLE HAWKINS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BROWN, RACHEL MAYA (AKA JOHNNYRAY DIXON BROWN)

Defendants

HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFFS OFFICE

HARRIS COUNTY ATTORNEY/ATTN: CHRISTIAN D. MENEFEE

HARRIS COUNTY GRAND JURY

TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY CRIME RECORDS DIVISION

HARRIS COUNTY OFFICE OF COURT SERVICES ATTN: CAROL OELLER

FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION RECORD INFORMATION/DISSEMINATION SECTI

APPRISS OPERATIONS CENTER

THE SOURCE FOR PUBLIC DATA, LP DBA PUBLICDATA.COM

HARRIS COUNTY CRIMINAL DISTRICT ATTORNEYS OFFICE, KIM OGG

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERKS OFFICE, MARILYN BURGESS

HARRIS COUNTY CLERK, TANESHIA HUDSPETH/ ATTN: EXPUNCTION UNIT

HOUSTON POLICE DEPARTMENT

FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION RECORD INFORMATION/DISSEMINATION SECTION

Others

HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE BY SERVING MAJOR MAC MCKELVY

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE BY SERVING BRIAN L. ROSE

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERK'S OFFICE BY SERVING RANDALL SMIDT

HARRIS COUNTY CLERK BY SERVING RANDALL SMIDT

HOUSTON POLICE DEPARTMENT BY SERVING DEIDRE HARRIS

HARRIS COUNTY ATTORNEY'S OFFICE BY SERVING RANDALL SMIDT

3 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HALL, CHELSI RENE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/09/2021
  • HearingCourt: 011; Docket Type: Law Day Docket; Reason: EXPUNCTION; Requesting Party: HALL, CHELSI RENE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORDER SIGNED SETTING HEARING; Order Signed: 6/15/2021;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: HALL, CHELSI RENE; Person Filing: BROWN, RACHEL MAYA (AKA JOHNNYRAY DIXON BROWN);

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Source for Public Data, L.P. is a litigant

Latest cases where HARRIS COUNTY ATTORNEY'S OFFICE BY SERVING RANDALL SMIDT is a litigant

Latest cases where HARRIS COUNTY OFFICE OF COURT SERVICES is a litigant

Latest cases where Harris County Clerk is a litigant