This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 09/18/2021 at 04:02:52 (UTC).

BROOKS, LANISE vs. HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEYS OFFICE

Case Summary

On 09/13/2021 BROOKS, LANISE filed an Other - Expungement lawsuit against HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEYS OFFICE. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is JERALYNN MANOR. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8610

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Expungement

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

JERALYNN MANOR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BROOKS, LANISE

Defendants

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEYS OFFICE

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERKS OFFICE

HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFFS OFFICE

HARRIS COUNTY CONSTABLE PRECINCT NO 7

5290 Griggs Rd,

Houston, TX 77021

TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY

HARRIS COUNTY PRETRIAL SERVICES

OFFICE OF COURT ADMINISTRATION

HARRIS COUNTY INSTITUTE OF FORENSIC SCIENCES

1861 Old Spanish Trail,

Houston, TX 77054

Others

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERK'S OFFICE BY SERVING RANDALL SMIDT

201 Caroline 2Nd Floor

Houston, TX 77002

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEYS OFFICE BY SERVING BRIAN L ROSE

500 Jefferson Suite 600

Houston, TX 77002

HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE BY SERVING MAJOR MAC MCKELVY

1200 Baker St

Houston, TX 77002

TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY BY SERVING EXPUNCTION UNIT

Po Box 4143

Austin, TX 78765

HARRIS COUNTY PRETRIAL SERVICES SERVING KELVIN L BANKS DIRECTOR

102 San Jacinto St

Houston, TX 77002

OFFICE OF COURT ADMINISTRACTION SERVICING MARGIE JOHNSON

205 W 14Th Street Suite 400

Austin, TX 78701

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ASHWORTH, KIMBERLY ANNE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/29/2021
  • HearingCourt: 080; Docket Type: Law Day Docket; Reason: EXPUNCTION (MOTION FOR)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY INSTITUTE OF FORENSIC SCIENCES; Issued: 9/15/2021; Tracking: 73915871; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY CONSTABLE PRECINCT NO 7; Issued: 9/15/2021; Tracking: 73915870; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: OFFICE OF COURT ADMINISTRACTION SERVICING MARGIE JOHNSON; Issued: 9/15/2021; Tracking: 73915229; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY PRETRIAL SERVICES SERVING KELVIN L BANKS DIRECTOR; Issued: 9/15/2021; Tracking: 73915227; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY BY SERVING EXPUNCTION UNIT; Issued: 9/15/2021; Tracking: 73915225; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE BY SERVING MAJOR MAC MCKELVY; Issued: 9/15/2021; Tracking: 73915224; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEYS OFFICE BY SERVING BRIAN L ROSE; Issued: 9/15/2021; Tracking: 73915221; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERK'S OFFICE BY SERVING RANDALL SMIDT; Issued: 9/15/2021; Tracking: 73915220; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORDER SIGNED SETTING HEARING; Order Signed: 9/14/2021;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: ASHWORTH, KIMBERLY ANNE; Person Filing: BROOKS, LANISE;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OFFICE OF COURT ADMINISTRACTION SERVICING MARGIE JOHNSON is a litigant

Latest cases where HARRIS COUNTY INSTITUTE OF FORENSIC SCIENCES is a litigant

Latest cases where HARRIS COUNTY CONSTABLE PRECINCT 4 is a litigant

Latest cases where OFFICE OF COURT ADMINISTRATION - LEGAL DIVISION is a litigant