This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 07/06/2015 at 00:23:01 (UTC).

BOZEMAN, ODIE vs. AIR LIQUIDE AMERICA CORP

Case Summary

On 01/05/2005 BOZEMAN, ODIE filed an Other - Complex Tort/Class Action lawsuit against AIR LIQUIDE AMERICA CORP. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0691

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2005

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Complex Tort/Class Action

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Defendants

BOZEMAN, ODIE

AMERICAN COLLOID COMPANY

SCHMIDT MANUFACTURING INC

E D BULLARD COMPANY

FLEXO PRODUCTS INC

LONE STAR INDUSTRIES INC

3M COMPANY (FKA MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY)

SAMMONS BW INC (FKA BRIGGS WEAVER INC)

PANGBORN CORP

EMPIRE ABRASIVE EQUIPMENT COMPANY

RANSBURG CORPORATION

THORSTENBERG MATERIALS COMPANY, INC.

ABDUL-HAQQ, LEROY

BLAYLOCK, DELLA

BRADLEY, ROSSEVELT

BYRUM, HOWARD

GOANA, MIGUEL

HARMON, RUSSELL

HOOD, JOHN

JONES, ROBERT

91 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MARTIN, KIRK E.

WARE, JAMES L.

WALZEL, MICHAEL RAY

Defendant Attorneys

ANDERSON, ROGER WILLIAM

ORETSKY, ANDREW S.

BRYANT, STEVE A.

JOHNSON, EDWARD WESLEY

KACAL, GEORGE JEROME JR.

PAPPAS, GEORGE P.

PYLE, MICHAEL

Other Attorneys

WELLS, PETER BOYD III

PHILLIPS, CLINTON EUGENE

TAYLOR, THOMAS B.

TAYLOR, DAVID M.

GREVE, KURT WILHELM

BASHLINE, JAMES DUANE

ELLINGTON, OWEN H.

GEER, EVA D.

COFFEY, WILLIAM B. JR.

PARKER, JERRY CLYDE

11 More Attorneys Available

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/20/2014
  • PARTIAL DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION-SILICA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2014
  • PARTIAL DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION-SILICA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2010
  • ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO ANOTHER DISTRICT COURT SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2010
  • TRANSFERRED TO ANOTHER HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2010
  • TRANSFERRED TO HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2008
  • ORDER SIGNED SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2008
  • ORDER SIGNED SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2007
  • ORDER SIGNED SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2006
  • PARTIAL DISMISSAL ON AGREEMENT OF PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2006
  • PARTIAL DISMISSAL ON AGREEMENT OF PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
85 More Docket Entries
  • 02/04/2005
  • SECOND AMENDED ANSWER FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETIT : Filing Attorney - VANCE, VANESSA LEE Person Filing - PALO ALTO SILICA SAND INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2005
  • MOTION TRANSFER VENUE : Filing Attorney - WEBB, WILLIAM CURTIS Person Filing - 3M COMPANY (FKA MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2005
  • MOTION TRANSFER VENUE : Filing Attorney - JOHNSON, EDWARD WESLEY Person Filing - FLEXO PRODUCTS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2005
  • CROSS ACTION : Filing Attorney - PYLE, MICHAEL Person Filing - PANGBORN CORP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2005
  • CROSS ACTION : Filing Attorney - PAPPAS, GEORGE P. Person Filing - SAMMONS BW INC (FKA BRIGGS WEAVER INC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2005
  • CROSS ACTION : Filing Attorney - RHODES, KENNETH D. Person Filing - LONE STAR INDUSTRIES INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2005
  • CROSS ACTION : Filing Attorney - WEBB, WILLIAM CURTIS Person Filing - 3M COMPANY (FKA MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2005
  • CROSS ACTION : Filing Attorney - WALZEL, MICHAEL RAY Person Filing - RANSBURG CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2005
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - HOSSLEY, DANIEL ALLEN Person Filing - HILL, BOBBY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2005
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - HOSSLEY, DANIEL ALLEN Person Filing - BOZEMAN, ODIE

    Read MoreRead Less