This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 01/26/2019 at 07:16:43 (UTC).

BOYERT, JOHN vs. CTLI LLC (A TEXAS LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY)

Case Summary

On 01/02/2019 BOYERT, JOHN filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against CTLI LLC A TEXAS LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is DEDRA DAVIS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0022

  • Filing Date:

    01/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

DEDRA DAVIS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BOYERT, JOHN

Defendants

PORTMORE SPORT ONE LLC (A TEXAS LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY)

PAMUNKEY LLC (A TEXAS LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY)

CTLI LLC (A TEXAS LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY)

HILL, MARTY

THE ESTATE OF CHARLES R BURNETT III

BOYERT SHOOTING CENTER - KATY LAND LLC (A TEXAS LIMITED LIABILITY

PAGEL DAVIS & HILL P C (A TEXAS PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION)

KEE, WILLIAM D (III)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PORTER, BRAD E.

1776 Yorktown

Houston, TX 77056

 

Court Documents

Exhibit O

01/14/2019: Exhibit O

Exhibit N

01/14/2019: Exhibit N

Exhibit L

01/14/2019: Exhibit L

Exhibit K

01/14/2019: Exhibit K

Exhibit J

01/14/2019: Exhibit J

Exhibit I

01/14/2019: Exhibit I

Exhibit H

01/14/2019: Exhibit H

Exhibit E

01/14/2019: Exhibit E

Exhibit D

01/14/2019: Exhibit D

Exhibit C

01/14/2019: Exhibit C

Notice of Oral Hearing

01/16/2019: Notice of Oral Hearing

Proposed Temporary Restraining Order

01/02/2019: Proposed Temporary Restraining Order

Exhibit E

01/02/2019: Exhibit E

Exhibit D

01/02/2019: Exhibit D

Exhibit C

01/02/2019: Exhibit C

Exhibit A

01/02/2019: Exhibit A

Plaintiff's Verified Original Petition Seeking An Application For Injunctive Relief And A Temporary Restraining Order

01/02/2019: Plaintiff's Verified Original Petition Seeking An Application For Injunctive Relief And A Temporary Restraining Order

Proposed Order

01/03/2019: Proposed Order

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2019
  • Description: ORDER SIGNED DENYING TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER; Order Signed: 1/4/2019;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • Description: APPEARANCE ON TEMPORARY INJ OR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORD;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • Description: MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER DENIED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • Description: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: PORTER, BRAD E.; Person Filing: BOYERT, JOHN;

    Read MoreRead Less